« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
TUCKER, STEVEN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ALBERT PEREZ - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
BAUMANN, ROBERT
Judge
Hotham
Case #
CR1988-007773-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1990
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
8/10/1990
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
8/14/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
& THE OFFENSE BE DESIGNATED A FELONY/ THE COURT NOTES THE DEF FAILED TO COMPLY; W/TERMS #2/ #12b/& #12d
Filing Date
3/7/1990
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1989
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/28/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED 3-27-89
Filing Date
3/15/1989
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
3/29/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
F/MODIFICATION O/SENTENCE
Filing Date
2/8/1989
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
2/9/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER/TRIAL GUILTY CT 2 POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA CL 1 NOW DESIGNATED A MISD; PROB 18 MONTHS; PROB FEES $10 PER MO BEGIN 3/1/89; FINE $2,000 @ $30 PER MO BEGIN 1/27/89; DISMISS CT 1 NO OTHER FEL CHGS TO BE FILED FROM PHX PD DR88-003839
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1989
Description
322 - ME: Presentence Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
2/2/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/1989
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/23/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/1989
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/27/1988
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
12/29/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/22/1988
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
12/27/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/9/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
12/13/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTERS SENT TO JUDGE YBARRA FOR HER FILES
Filing Date
12/7/1988
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/13/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
12/8/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/1988
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1988
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
10/31/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
8-15-88
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
10/28/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/1988
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1988
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/1988
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/23/1988
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
9/29/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/23/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1988
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1988
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1988
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 POSSESSION OR USE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2 POSSESSION OR USE OF MARIJUANA CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
8/22/1988
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
8/23/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: POSSESSION/USE NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSSESSION/USE MARIJUANA CL 6 FEL; DR 88-003839 PPD
Filing Date
8/22/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/23/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF WIT LIST SUMMONS W/SERVICE; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE DEF FIN STMNT/PET APPT COUNSEL & ORDER; RELEASE ORDER-O/R 7-26-88 ORDER HOLDING DEF; JC DOCKET (DEF ATTY-ROB BAUMAN) TRANSMITTAL CERT
Filing Date
8/22/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/23/1988
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/30/1988
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty