« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
KNOPF, WILLIAM
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1987-009581-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1991
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/1989
Description
PMP - PET: Modify Cond Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/26/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/1988
Description
PMP - PET: Modify Cond Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/1988
Description
118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/1987
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/1987
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
12/14/1987
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
12/14/1987
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
12/18/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/14/1987
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUILTY-DUI O/INTOXICATING LIQUOR W/LIC SUSPENDED/CANCELLED/REVOKED/REFUSED/; CL5 FEL PROB (3) YR, 121487; AZ DEPT CORR, 6 MTHS, 121487; MTLY PROB FEE $30; ASSES; $100, $5; PYMTS COMM 090188; SHERIFF TO TRANSPORT TO AZ DEPT CORR; DEF ORD PAY $30 EMERGENCY MEDICAL FUND PER ARS 36-2219
Filing Date
11/25/1987
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
12/4/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/1987
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim HRG/PLEA - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUILTY-DWI WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED CANCELLED REFUSED REVOKED CL5 FEL; PLEA ACCEPTED; MDI-ALLEGATION O/DANGEROUSNESS
Filing Date
10/29/1987
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRIVING UNDER INFLUENCE INTOXICATING LIQUOR W/LICENSE SUSPENDED/CANCELLED/; REVOKED/REFUSED CL 5 FEL
Filing Date
10/23/1927
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF WITNESS LIST ORD REGARDING COUNSEL/REIM: PUB DEF; SUMMONS W/SERVICE REL ORDER: OWN RECOGNIZNACE; REL QUESTIONNAIRE WAIVER OF PRELIM/HRG W/PLEA AGR; DEF FINANCIAL STATEMENT ORDER HOLDING DEF; ORD REGARDING COUNSEL/REIM JP DOCKET
Filing Date
10/23/1927
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRIVING WHEN UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF INTOXICATING LIQUOR WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED; CANCELLED REVOKED OR REFUSED A CLASS 5 FELONY; PPD DR 87-103674
Filing Date
10/23/1927
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
**SUPERIOR COURT PLEADING BEGAN**
Filing Date
10/23/1927
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/29/1987
Time
13:30
Event
Original Guilty Plea Arraignment