« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2012-158022
Judge:
Sears, Elaissia
File Date:
11/8/2012
Location:
West Mesa Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
J Douglas Mangum
Party Name
Terrence Dwayne Culver
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Mark Weingart
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2012
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
11/8/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Arraignment
Date
1/15/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/12/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/12/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/16/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/19/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/21/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/16/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/22/2015
Time
9:5
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/23/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.