Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-015915 | Judge: | Thomason, Timothy |
File Date: | 12/5/2022 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Katie Hobbs | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
November 8 2022 General Election For Attorney General | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per | |
Superintendent Of Public Instruction | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per | |
State Representative For District 13 | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per | |
KRIS MAYES | Intervenor | Female | DANIEL BARR |
ABRAHAM HAMADEH | Intervenor | Male | Timothy Lasota |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/6/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
1/4/2023 | EMF - Email Filed | 1/9/2023 | |
1/4/2023 | RNM - Returned Mail | 1/4/2023 | |
NOTE: | |||
1/3/2023 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 1/5/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION / WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
12/29/2022 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene / EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
12/29/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Stay | |||
12/29/2022 | ANS - Answer | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Proposed Answer in Intervention | |||
12/29/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: REGARDING RECOUNT RESULTS ATTORNEY GENERAL SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION AND STATE REPRESENTATIVE IN LEGISLATIVE DISTRICT 13 | |||
12/29/2022 | REP - Report | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: SECRETARY OF STATES REPORT OF RECOUNT RESULTS AND REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER CERTIFYING RESULTS | |||
12/29/2022 | DCL - Declaration | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF KORI LORICK | |||
12/29/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel with Client Consent | |||
12/29/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 12/29/2022 | |
12/23/2022 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 12/23/2022 | |
12/22/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/22/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION OT CONTINUE HEARING FOR THE PRESENTATION OF RECOUNT RESULTS | |||
12/20/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Hearing for the Presentation of Recount Results | |||
12/14/2022 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 12/14/2022 | |
12/13/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/13/2022 | |
12/12/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice Regarding Filing of Election Contest | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to File Response to Amicus Curiae Abraham Hamadeh's Brief | |||
12/12/2022 | RES - Response | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Response to Amicus Curiae Abraham Hamadeh's Brief | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF | |||
12/6/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 12/6/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | APE - Application/Petition | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO CONDUCT RECOUNT |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/13/2022 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
12/22/2022 | 9:00 | Hearing |
12/29/2022 | 10:00 | Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |