Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-015921 | Judge: | Blanchard, John |
File Date: | 12/5/2022 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Arizona Creditors Bar Association Inc | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Protect Our Arizona P A C | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Absolute Resolutions Investments L L C | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Hameroff Law Group P C | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Desert Ridge Community Association | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Augusta Ranch Community Master Association | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Bauhinia L L C | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
Cash Time Title Loans Inc | Plaintiff | Brett Johnson | |
State Of Arizona | Defendant | Brian Bergin | |
ARIZONANS FED UP WITH FAILING HEALTHCARE | Intervenor | James Barton |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/10/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/10/2023 | |
1/5/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
1/3/2023 | NOT - Notice | 1/4/2023 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
1/3/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 1/4/2023 | |
12/30/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 1/3/2023 | |
12/30/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
12/28/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
12/28/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/30/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Appeal | |||
12/27/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 12/27/2022 | |
12/23/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL | |||
12/23/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/28/2022 | |
NOTE: INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL | |||
12/23/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Intervenor Notice of Cross Appeal EFILE BILLING $100 | |||
12/23/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONAS NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL | |||
12/22/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS ARIZONA CREDITORS BAR ASSOCIATION INC., ET AL.’S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL | |||
12/22/2022 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 12/22/2022 | |
12/22/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal/PD 100 REC 29064313 | |||
12/20/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/20/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Supplement to Hearing Exhibit List | |||
12/15/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: This Court hereby grants the combined motion | |||
12/14/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
12/13/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS ARIZONA CREDITORS BAR ASSOCIATION INC., ET AL.’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS RE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
12/12/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: COMMITTEE’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINIG ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND COMMITTEE’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
12/12/2022 | RES - Response | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
12/9/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Order | |||
12/9/2022 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Joint Hearing Exhibit List | |||
12/8/2022 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/8/2022 | |
12/8/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 12/8/2022 | |
12/7/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/8/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice Regarding Compliance with A.R.S. 12-1841 | |||
12/7/2022 | REQ - Request | 12/9/2022 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
12/7/2022 | TRO - Temporary Restraining Order | 12/7/2022 | |
12/6/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/8/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance for Defendant State of Arizona | |||
12/6/2022 | 504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment | 12/6/2022 | |
12/6/2022 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 12/6/2022 | |
12/6/2022 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 12/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service / STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
12/6/2022 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 12/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Intervene EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
12/6/2022 | REQ - Request | 12/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
12/5/2022 | COM - Complaint | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | APL - Application | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
12/5/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH NOTICE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/7/2022 | 9:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/16/2022 | 14:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
12/22/2022 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
12/22/2022 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only |