Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2020-014562 Judge: Mahoney, Margaret
File Date: 11/12/2020 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Laurie Aguilera   Plaintiff  Female  Alexander Kolodin 
Donovan Drobina   Plaintiff  Male  Alexander Kolodin 
Adrian Fontes   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Clint Hickman   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Jack Sellers   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Steve Chucri   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Bill Gates   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Steve Gallardo   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Maricopa County   Defendant    Thomas Liddy 
Arizona Democratic Party   Intervenor    Sarah Gonski 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/23/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  11/23/2020   
11/23/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  11/23/2020   
11/20/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/20/2020   
11/20/2020  085 - ME: Conference  11/20/2020   
11/20/2020  WSH - Worksheet  11/20/2020   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING WORKSHEET 
11/19/2020  EMF - Email Filed  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/24/2020   
11/19/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/23/2020   
11/19/2020  MIL - Motion In Limine  11/19/2020   
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Witnesses 
11/19/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/19/2020   
NOTE: Parties Supplemental Joint Witness and Exhibits Lists 
11/19/2020  MTQ - Motion To Quash  11/19/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENSE MOTION TO QUASH 30(B)(6) SUBPOENAS 
11/19/2020  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/19/2020   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES 
11/18/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/19/2020   
NOTE: Parties Joint Witness and Exhibit Lists 
11/18/2020  RES - Response  11/19/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss 
11/17/2020  STA - Statement  11/17/2020   
NOTE: JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT AND RULE 7.1(h) GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT 
11/17/2020  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/17/2020   
11/17/2020  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Association of Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
11/17/2020  REQ - Request  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Arizona Democratic Party's Request for Court Reporter at the November 18, 2020 Oral Argument 
11/17/2020  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  11/17/2020   
11/17/2020  NOT - Notice  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Arizona Democratic Party's Notice of Errata Regarding Request for Court Reporter at Oral Argument 
11/17/2020  RES - Response  11/18/2020   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/16/2020  087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/16/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/16/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
11/16/2020  087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued  11/16/2020   
11/15/2020  NOT - Notice  11/16/2020   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO THE HONORABLE MARGARET MAHONEY 
11/15/2020  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/16/2020   
NOTE: ARIZONA DEMOCRATIC PARTY'S MOTION TO INTERVENE - EFILE BILLING $333 
11/15/2020  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Plainitffs' Opposition to Arizona Democratic Party's Motion to Intervene 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Adrian Fontes 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Steve Chucri 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Steve Gallardo 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Bill Gates 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Clint Hickman 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Maricopa County 
11/15/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: Declaration of Service Jack Sellers 
11/13/2020  ORD - Order  11/16/2020   
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING 
11/13/2020  001 - ME: Disqualification  11/13/2020   
11/13/2020  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  11/13/2020   
11/13/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/13/2020  MOT - Motion  11/13/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO HONORABLE MARGARET MAHONEY 
11/13/2020  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  11/13/2020   
11/12/2020  COM - Complaint  11/13/2020   
11/12/2020  CSH - Coversheet  11/13/2020   
11/12/2020  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/13/2020   
11/12/2020  APL - Application  11/13/2020   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/16/2020  10:00  Order To Show Cause 
11/16/2020  15:30  Order To Show Cause 
11/19/2020  11:15  Status Conference 
11/19/2020  16:30  Status Conference 
11/20/2020  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file