Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2020-014553 Judge: Hannah, John
File Date: 11/12/2020 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Arizona Republican Party   Plaintiff    John Wilenchik 
Adrian Fontes   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors   Defendant    Emily Craiger 
Clint Hickman   Defendant  Male  Joseph Vigil 
Jack Sellers   Defendant  Male  Joseph Branco 
Steve Chucri   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Bill Gates   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Steve Gallardo   Defendant  Male  Thomas Liddy 
Arizona Democratic Party   Intervenor    Pro Per 
Katie Hobbs   Intervenor  Female  David Gaona 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/28/2022  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  10/28/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Counsel Within Firm 
9/23/2022  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  9/23/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Counsel Within Firm 
8/24/2022  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  8/25/2022   
8/24/2022  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  8/25/2022   
NOTE: ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION 
6/27/2022  RNM - Returned Mail  6/28/2022   
6/20/2022  AIX - Appeals Index  6/21/2022   
6/20/2022  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  6/21/2022   
6/14/2022  019 - ME: Ruling  6/14/2022   
6/9/2022  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  6/10/2022   
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration re Minute Entry Dated June 6, 2022. 
6/6/2022  019 - ME: Ruling  6/6/2022   
6/3/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/3/2022   
4/27/2022  NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney  4/28/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel 
4/13/2022  NOT - Notice  4/13/2022   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Court of Appeals Filings Relevant to Motion to Disqualify 
4/11/2022  NOT - Notice  4/12/2022   
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ NOTICE OF COURT OF APPEALS FILING RELEVANT TO PENDING MOTION 
4/5/2022  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  4/6/2022   
NOTE: ORDER STAYING APPEAL 
2/9/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/9/2022   
2/7/2022  019 - ME: Ruling  2/7/2022   
2/4/2022  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order  2/4/2022   
2/2/2022  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  2/2/2022   
2/2/2022  001 - ME: Disqualification  2/2/2022   
2/2/2022  RES - Response  2/3/2022   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDICIAL OFFICER FOR CAUSE 
1/26/2022  MOT - Motion  1/28/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDICIAL OFFICER FOR CAUSE 
9/14/2021  AIX - Appeals Index  9/15/2021   
NOTE: AMENDED 
9/14/2021  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  9/15/2021   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
9/1/2021  MEM - Memorandum  9/2/2021   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS 
5/3/2021  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  5/5/2021   
NOTE: ARIZONA REPUBLICAN PARTY $18237.59 
4/22/2021  ORD - Order  4/22/2021   
NOTE: SETTING SUPERSEDEAS BOND 
4/13/2021  NOT - Notice  4/14/2021   
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
4/13/2021  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  4/14/2021   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
4/13/2021  AIX - Appeals Index  4/14/2021   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
4/12/2021  REL - Reply  4/14/2021   
NOTE: Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET SUPERSEDEAS BOND 
4/5/2021  RES - Response  4/5/2021   
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs Response to Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond 
3/30/2021  STA - Statement  3/30/2021   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Appellants Statement of Issues on Appeal 
3/30/2021  RES - Response  3/30/2021   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET SUPERSEDEAS BOND 
3/24/2021  MOT - Motion  3/25/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond 
3/15/2021  019 - ME: Ruling  3/15/2021   
3/15/2021  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/16/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal-PAID $100 RECEIPT 28169313 
1/11/2021  REL - Reply  1/12/2021   
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Reply in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees 
12/28/2020  RES - Response  12/29/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Response to Motion for Sanctions 
12/21/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  12/21/2020   
12/7/2020  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  12/8/2020   
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Application for Attorneys' Fees 
11/19/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  11/19/2020   
11/18/2020  REL - Reply  11/18/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Reply re Injunctive Relief 
11/18/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/18/2020   
11/17/2020  RES - Response  11/18/2020   
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
11/17/2020  RES - Response  11/18/2020   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO ARIZONA REPUBLICAN PARTY’S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 
11/17/2020  RES - Response  11/18/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Response to Defendant/Intervenors Motions to Dismiss 
11/17/2020  RES - Response  11/18/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
11/17/2020  REQ - Request  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Arizona Democratic Party's Request for Court Reporter at the November 18 2020 Oral Argument 
11/16/2020  ORD - Order  11/17/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING INTERVENTION 
11/16/2020  ORD - Order  11/17/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE 
11/16/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/16/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: JACK SELLERS 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: ADRIAN FONTES 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: STEVE CHUCRI 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/16/2020   
NOTE: BILL GATES 
11/16/2020  SUM - Summons  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/16/2020   
11/16/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Motion to Dismiss 
11/16/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/17/2020   
NOTE: INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT 
11/16/2020  APL - Application  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Application for Preliminary Injunction 
11/16/2020  MTA - Motion To Amend  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 
11/13/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/13/2020  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Intervene 
11/13/2020  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Intervene 
11/13/2020  OSC - Order To Show Cause  11/16/2020   
11/12/2020  COM - Complaint  11/12/2020   
11/12/2020  CSH - Coversheet  11/12/2020   
11/12/2020  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/12/2020   
11/12/2020  APL - Application  11/12/2020   
NOTE: FOR ORER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/16/2020  10:30  Order To Show Cause 
11/18/2020  15:15  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file