Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2020-014248 Judge: Russell, Andrew
File Date: 11/7/2020 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Donald J Trump For President Inc   Plaintiff    Thomas Basile 
Republican National Committee   Plaintiff    Thomas Basile 
Arizona Republican Party   Plaintiff    Thomas Basile 
Katie Hobbs   Defendant  Female  Roopali Desai 
Adrian Fontes   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Jack Sellers   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Steve Chucri   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Bill Gates   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Clint Hickman   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Steve Gallardo   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Arizona Democratic Party   Intervenor    Sarah Gonski 
Lincoln Project, The   Endorsement Case    BRUCE SAMUELS 
Arizona Free Enterprise Club   Endorsement Case    Timothy Lasota 
Arizona Public Integrity Alliance   Endorsement Case    Timothy Lasota 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/17/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/17/2020   
11/17/2020  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  11/20/2020   
11/16/2020  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  11/16/2020   
11/13/2020  NOT - Notice  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Partial Mootness 
11/13/2020  NOT - Notice  11/13/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE REGARDING BALLOT COUNTS 
11/13/2020  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/13/2020   
11/13/2020  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/13/2020   
11/11/2020  MIL - Motion In Limine  11/12/2020   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 
11/11/2020  MOT - Motion  11/12/2020   
NOTE: COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT LIST 
11/11/2020  MOT - Motion  11/12/2020   
NOTE: ARIZONA FREE ENTERPRISE CLUB AND ARIZONA PUBLIC INTEGRITY ALLIANCE’S MOTION TO FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS 
11/10/2020  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/10/2020   
11/10/2020  MOT - Motion  11/10/2020   
NOTE: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION 
11/10/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/10/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/10/2020  RES - Response  11/10/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO SEAL 
11/10/2020  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  11/10/2020   
NOTE: WITH CONSENT 
11/10/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/10/2020   
11/10/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  11/10/2020   
11/10/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/10/2020   
NOTE: List of Witnesses and Exhibits 
11/10/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/10/2020   
NOTE: Defendant Katie Hobbs's Witness and Exhibit Lists 
11/10/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/10/2020   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
11/10/2020  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  11/10/2020   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
11/10/2020  MOT - Motion  11/12/2020   
NOTE: The Lincoln Project's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief 
11/10/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/12/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS AND PRE-TRIAL BRIEF 
11/10/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/12/2020   
NOTE: INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT 
11/10/2020  MEM - Memorandum  11/12/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Memorandum 
11/10/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/12/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/9/2020  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/9/2020   
11/9/2020  NOT - Notice  11/9/2020   
NOTE: PROPOSED VERIFIED COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION 
11/9/2020  NOF - Notice Of Filing  11/9/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Filing 
11/9/2020  NOF - Notice Of Filing  11/9/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Filing 
11/9/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  11/9/2020   
11/9/2020  NOT - Notice  11/9/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Clarification and Withdrawal of Associated Counsel (With Consent) 
11/9/2020  OSC - Order To Show Cause  11/9/2020   
11/9/2020  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  11/9/2020   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
11/9/2020  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/9/2020   
NOTE: ARIZONA DEMOCRATIC PARTY’S MOTION TO INTERVENE / eFile Billing $333.00 
11/8/2020  NOT - Notice  11/9/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION AND WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNSEL WITH CONSENT 
11/7/2020  COM - Complaint  11/9/2020   
11/7/2020  CSH - Coversheet  11/9/2020   
11/7/2020  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/9/2020   
11/7/2020  APL - Application  11/9/2020   
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/9/2020  15:00  Order To Show Cause 
11/10/2020  11:00  Hearing 
11/12/2020  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
11/13/2020  15:30  Status Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file