Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-012036 Judge: McCoy, M. Scott
File Date: 8/31/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Landmark On Central L L C   Plaintiff    Alexander Kolodin 
Brothers Tailor & Clothing Inc   Plaintiff    Pro Per 
Danielle Sutton   Plaintiff  Female  Pro Per 
Landmark Towers Condominium Association   Defendant    Augustus Shaw 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/22/2020  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  4/22/2020   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
4/17/2020  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  4/20/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 
3/4/2020  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  3/4/2020   
2/26/2020  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/26/2020   
2/26/2020  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  2/28/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
2/25/2020  EMF - Email Filed  2/27/2020   
2/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/27/2020   
2/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/27/2020   
2/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/27/2020   
2/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/27/2020   
2/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/27/2020   
2/21/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  2/21/2020   
2/21/2020  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/21/2020   
2/20/2020  EMF - Email Filed  2/21/2020   
NOTE: EXHIBIT 4 EXHIBIT 5 AND EXHIBIT 6 
2/14/2020  005 - ME: Hearing  2/14/2020   
10/28/2019  SCO – Scheduling Order  10/28/2019   
NOTE: JOINT FIFTH REVISED 
8/12/2019  SCO – Scheduling Order  8/12/2019   
NOTE: Joint Fourth Revised 
7/19/2019  ORD - Order  7/22/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement Conference 
6/24/2019  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  6/24/2019   
6/7/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/7/2019   
6/7/2019  SCO – Scheduling Order  6/7/2019   
NOTE: Joint Third Revised 
4/16/2019  SCO – Scheduling Order  4/16/2019   
NOTE: Joint / Second Revised 
12/18/2018  SCO – Scheduling Order  12/18/2018   
NOTE: Revised 
12/4/2018  RES - Response  12/5/2018   
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 
11/13/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  11/13/2018   
11/7/2018  RES - Response  11/8/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration 
11/1/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/1/2018   
10/30/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  10/30/2018   
10/23/2018  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/24/2018   
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration 
10/16/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference  10/16/2018   
10/16/2018  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/16/2018   
10/12/2018  RES - Response  10/15/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND APRIL 9TH, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER AND REQUEST TO BE NOTIFIED IF RESPONSIVE BRIEFING IS REQUIRED 
10/9/2018  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/9/2018   
10/3/2018  MTA - Motion To Amend  10/4/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO AMEND APRIL 9TH, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER 
9/19/2018  REL - Reply  9/20/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S (AMENDED) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT  
9/19/2018  REL - Reply  9/20/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF ERRATA/CLARIFICATION IN RE DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/14/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  9/14/2018   
9/7/2018  REL - Reply  9/11/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
8/27/2018  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  8/27/2018   
8/24/2018  RES - Response  8/27/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
8/9/2018  REL - Reply  8/10/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Response to First Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 
7/19/2018  SOF - Statement Of Facts  7/23/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE/CROSS-MOTION TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [P1] 
7/19/2018  RES - Response  7/23/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/19/2018  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/21/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [P1] 
6/11/2018  ORD - Order  6/11/2018   
NOTE: Order Extending the time for Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Motion for Summary Judgment until June 19th, 2018 
6/4/2018  STP - Stipulation  6/5/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
5/7/2018  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit  5/9/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit/KOLODIN LAW GROUP PLLC IOLTA $10,000.00 
5/1/2018  ORD - Order  5/5/2018   
NOTE: AMENDED/ GRANDING RELEASE OF PLAINTIFFS RULE 65C SECURITY BOND TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL 
4/23/2018  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond  4/23/2018   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING RELEASE OF PLAINTIFFS’ RULE 65(C) SECURITY BOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ COUNSEL 
4/18/2018  STP - Stipulation  4/20/2018   
NOTE: Stipulation to Release Plaintiff's Rule 65(C) Security Bond to Plaintiffs' Counsel 
4/11/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference  4/11/2018   
4/4/2018  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  4/4/2018   
4/4/2018  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/5/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance and Addition of Counsel of Record (within same firm) 
4/4/2018  STA - Statement  4/5/2018   
NOTE: Statement Regarding Absence at Hearing Dated March 28, 2018 
4/3/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  4/3/2018   
4/3/2018  SCO – Scheduling Order  4/3/2018   
NOTE: Order 
3/21/2018  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  3/23/2018   
NOTE: Joint Report 
3/7/2018  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  3/7/2018   
3/5/2018  NOT - Notice  3/6/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
2/28/2018  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  2/28/2018   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF DANIELLE SUTTON’S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT LANDMARK TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 
2/28/2018  MOT - Motion  3/1/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Set 
2/21/2018  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  2/22/2018   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff Danielle Sutton's Claims against Defendant Landmark CondoMINIUM Association 
12/28/2017  ANS - Answer  12/29/2017   
NOTE: Defendant Landmark Towers Codominium Association's Verified Answer 
12/19/2017  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  12/22/2017   
NOTE: LANDMARK ON CENTRAL LLC $10000 
11/21/2017  ORD - Order  11/21/2017   
NOTE: RE PRIVATE MEDIATION 
11/16/2017  ORD - Order  11/16/2017   
NOTE: VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR NOVEMBER 20, 2017 AT 8:30 A.M. 
11/16/2017  STP - Stipulation  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 
11/9/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  11/9/2017   
11/9/2017  MOT - Motion  11/13/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Vacate Status Conference 
11/6/2017  REQ - Request  11/7/2017   
NOTE: Request for Status Conference 
10/18/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  10/27/2017   
10/17/2017  ORD - Order  10/17/2017   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER 
10/11/2017  STP - Stipulation  10/12/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer 
10/6/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/6/2017   
10/4/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/4/2017   
9/28/2017  REL - Reply  9/29/2017   
NOTE: LANDMARK TOWNERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS 
9/25/2017  STA - Statement  9/26/2017   
NOTE: Joint Pretrial Statement Preliminary Injunction Hearing October 2, 2017 
9/25/2017  RES - Response  9/26/2017   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 
9/25/2017  REL - Reply  9/26/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
9/22/2017  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  9/22/2017   
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CHARLES (“CHUCK”) BRESSI WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
9/20/2017  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  9/20/2017   
9/18/2017  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Charles Bressi without Prejudice 
9/18/2017  RES - Response  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 
9/18/2017  CER - Certificate  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate Motion to Dismiss Required Joinder 
9/18/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
9/18/2017  CER - Certificate  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate Motion to Dismiss Required Joinder 
9/13/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  9/14/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
9/12/2017  056 - ME: Hearing Set  9/12/2017   
9/8/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/13/2017   
NOTE: LANDMARK TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 
9/8/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/13/2017   
NOTE: CHARLES BRESSI 
9/8/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/14/2017   
NOTE: CHARLES BRESSI 
9/8/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/14/2017   
NOTE: LANDMARK TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION 
9/8/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  9/11/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance OF COUNSEL 
9/6/2017  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  9/8/2017   
NOTE: ON INJUNCTION ARS 10-3304B2, 12-1801-1810, ARCP 65 
8/31/2017  COM - Complaint  9/5/2017   
8/31/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  9/5/2017   
8/31/2017  CSH - Coversheet  9/5/2017   
8/31/2017  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  9/5/2017   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/11/2017  9:30  Order To Show Cause 
10/2/2017  13:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
11/20/2017  8:30  Status Conference 
3/28/2018  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
4/9/2018  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/5/2018  10:30  Oral Argument 
10/11/2018  14:00  Status Conference 
1/4/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/14/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2019  9:00  Civil Settlement Conference 
8/28/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/9/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/26/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
2/12/2020  9:45  Status Conference 
2/20/2020  10:00  Status Conference 
2/27/2020  9:30  Status Conference 
3/2/2020  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file