Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | TX2016-000360 | Judge: | Agne, Sara |
File Date: | 4/18/2016 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Tax |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue | Plaintiff | Penny Moore | |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Bank Of America N A | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per | |
K D M Contracting Inc | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/9/2019 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 10/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Release and Quash of Writ of Garnishment | |||
9/19/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/24/2019 | |
9/19/2019 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 9/20/2019 | |
9/16/2019 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 9/17/2019 | |
4/30/2019 | ORD - Order | 4/30/2019 | |
NOTE: DISCHARGING GARNISHEE | |||
4/22/2019 | PTT - Petition | 4/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee | |||
1/9/2019 | OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien | 1/9/2019 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
12/26/2018 | APL - Application | 12/27/2018 | |
NOTE: Application for Order of Continuing Lien | |||
12/6/2018 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 12/11/2018 | Garnishee Defendant(5) |
11/29/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2018 | |
11/29/2018 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 12/4/2018 | |
11/26/2018 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 11/27/2018 | |
4/26/2017 | ORD - Order | 4/26/2017 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE (NON-EARNINGS) | |||
4/21/2017 | PTT - Petition | 4/22/2017 | |
NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee | |||
4/13/2017 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 4/18/2017 | Garnishee Defendant(4) |
4/6/2017 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 4/13/2017 | |
4/6/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/13/2017 | |
3/29/2017 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 4/3/2017 | |
9/2/2016 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 9/9/2016 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
8/18/2016 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 8/19/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion for Default Judgment without Hearing and Affidavit in Support of Motion | |||
8/11/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/11/2016 | |
7/28/2016 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 7/29/2016 | |
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default | |||
7/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service on Todd A. Jostes | |||
7/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service on Jostes Concrete Inc | |||
7/11/2016 | SUM - Summons | 7/18/2016 | |
7/11/2016 | SUM - Summons | 7/18/2016 | |
7/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/21/2016 | |
7/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/21/2016 | |
4/21/2016 | LET - Letter | 4/25/2016 | |
4/18/2016 | COM - Complaint | 4/22/2016 | |
4/18/2016 | CSH - Coversheet | 4/22/2016 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
9/2/2016 | F:State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue | $16,628.51 | One Time | Interest | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
9/2/2016 | F:State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue | $9,910.87 | One Time | Charges | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
9/2/2016 | F:State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue | $40,367.28 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes |