« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2012-012249
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
12/4/2012
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Riverbend Homeowners Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Carl Anderson
Party Name
Anitra D Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
A B H O W
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2015
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2014
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
7/17/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHEE'S NONEXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
7/17/2014
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
8/1/2014
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
6/26/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2012
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
12/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY FROM MARYVALE JUSTICE COURT
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
12/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Riverbend Homeowners Association
A: Anitra D Hemphill
Amount
$133.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Satisfied
Date
12/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Riverbend Homeowners Association
A: Anitra D Hemphill
Amount
$525.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Satisfied
Date
12/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Riverbend Homeowners Association
A: Anitra D Hemphill
Amount
$1,410.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied