Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: TJ2012-002167 Judge: Cronin, Mary
File Date: 7/3/2012 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Transcript Judgment  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Arcadia Residences Owners Association, The   Plaintiff    Kristen Rosenbeck 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/3/2014  022 - ME: Order Signed  2/3/2014   
1/30/2014  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  2/6/2014   
1/13/2014  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  1/16/2014   
1/13/2014  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  1/16/2014   
NOTE: STIPULATED 
10/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  10/14/2013   
9/12/2013  OJA - Order Req. Jdgmnt/Debtor Appear For Exam  9/16/2013   
8/29/2013  MOT - Motion  9/5/2013   
NOTE: FOR PETITION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS EXAM 
4/2/2013  005 - ME: Hearing  4/2/2013   
4/2/2013  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/2/2013   
4/1/2013  JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee  4/11/2013   
3/13/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/21/2013   
2/20/2013  ORD - Order  2/22/2013   
NOTE: REQUIRING GARNISHEE TO APPEAR AND ANSWER 
2/14/2013  PTT - Petition  2/15/2013   
NOTE: REQUIRING GARNISHEE TO APPEAR AND ANSWER 
12/27/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/31/2012   
10/17/2012  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  10/24/2012   
7/3/2012  DJU - Default Judgment  7/5/2012   
NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM ARCADIA BILTMORE JUSTICE COURT 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/29/2013  11:30  Order To Show Cause 
12/3/2013  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
7/3/2012  F:Arcadia Residences Owners Association, The  $5,863.37  One Time  Total  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell