Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | TJ2011-001222 | Judge: | Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned |
File Date: | 2/16/2011 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Transcript Judgment |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
C A C H, L L C | Plaintiff | Kathryn Neuheisel | |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
J P Morgan Chase Bank N A | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/19/2016 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 9/27/2016 | Garnishee Defendant(3) |
9/12/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/19/2016 | |
9/12/2016 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 9/14/2016 | |
7/12/2016 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 7/14/2016 | |
1/22/2016 | ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment | 1/27/2016 | |
6/4/2015 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 6/5/2015 | |
5/7/2015 | STP - Stipulation | 5/12/2015 | |
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
2/16/2011 | DJU - Default Judgment | 2/17/2011 | |
NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM HASSAYAMPA JUSTICE COURT |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
1/22/2016 | F:C A C H, L L C | $12,668.50 | One Time | Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment | Modified |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
2/16/2011 | F:C A C H, L L C | $8,112.04 | One Time | Total | Modified |
A: Todd Jostes |