« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2010-006545
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
4/8/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Applied Bank
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Alan Levinsky
Party Name
Anthony F Nuccio
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Dawn Nuccio
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Rv Company
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
12/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
7/13/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2010
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
6/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
6/8/2010
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
6/29/2010
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
6/7/2010
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
6/17/2010
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
5/19/2010
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/25/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2010
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
4/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY FROM KYRENE JC
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
4/8/2010
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Applied Bank
A: Anthony F Nuccio
Amount
$510.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/8/2010
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Applied Bank
A: Anthony F Nuccio
Amount
$155.60
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/8/2010
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Applied Bank
A: Anthony F Nuccio
Amount
$2,548.97
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied