Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: TJ2009-008541 Judge: Marquoit, Thomas
File Date: 6/23/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Transcript Judgment  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
McDowell Mountain Ranch Community Association   Plaintiff    Brian Morgan 
Robert Feiler   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Redflex Traffic Systems Inc   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/27/2010  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  1/28/2010   
NOTE: AND WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
1/14/2010  REP - Report  1/15/2010   
NOTE: OF JUDGMENT BALANCE 
10/6/2009  REP - Report  10/7/2009   
NOTE: OF JUDGMENT BALANCE 
9/17/2009  OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien  9/23/2009   
NOTE: ON EARNINGS UPON ANSWER OF GARNISHEE 
9/3/2009  APL - Application  9/4/2009   
NOTE: ORDER FOR CONTINUING LIEN 
8/13/2009  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  8/28/2009  Garnishee Defendant(3)  
8/7/2009  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  8/10/2009   
8/7/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/10/2009   
8/5/2009  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  8/7/2009   
6/23/2009  DJU - Default Judgment  6/24/2009   
NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM MCDOWELL MOUNTAIN JUSTICE COURT 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
6/23/2009  F:McDowell Mountain Ranch Community Association  $212.15  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Robert Feiler         
6/23/2009  F:McDowell Mountain Ranch Community Association  $300.00  One Time  Interest  Satisfied 
  A: Robert Feiler         
6/23/2009  F:McDowell Mountain Ranch Community Association  $1,191.27  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Robert Feiler