« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2008-003441
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
3/7/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Capital One Bank
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Frederick Dias
Party Name
Keith R Boxrud
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Rv Company
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2009
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
12/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2009
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
11/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS TO KEITH R BOXRUD
Filing Date
10/30/2009
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
11/10/2009
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/22/2009
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2008
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2008
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
3/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM WEST MESA JC
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Capital One Bank
A: Keith R Boxrud
A: Keith R Boxrud
Amount
$308.48
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Capital One Bank
A: Keith R Boxrud
A: Keith R Boxrud
Amount
$102.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Capital One Bank
A: Keith R Boxrud
A: Keith R Boxrud
Amount
$313.53
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Capital One Bank
A: Keith R Boxrud
A: Keith R Boxrud
Amount
$1,402.17
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status