« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2008-003278
Judge:
Altieri, Jeffrey
File Date:
3/7/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
State Of Arizona Department Of Economic Security
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Robert Dunn
Party Name
Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
U S Collections West Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2008
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED US COLLECTIONS WEST INC ON 07/30/2008
Filing Date
8/7/2008
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
8/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CERTIFY MAILING OF NOTICES TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR
Filing Date
7/24/2008
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
7/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2008
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM DOWNTOWN JC
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
State Of Arizona Department Of Economic Security
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Amount
$1,284.24
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
State Of Arizona Department Of Economic Security
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Amount
$37.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
3/7/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
State Of Arizona Department Of Economic Security
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Amount
$2,528.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified