« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2006-002876
Judge:
Kaiser, Brian
File Date:
5/1/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Unifund C C R Partners
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
David Lippman
Party Name
Beverly A Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Dream Finders Llc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
West Usa Realty Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sonoran Enviroscapes Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Federal Credit Union
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR HAMEROFF LAW GROUP PC
Filing Date
3/11/2021
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LINE
Filing Date
2/24/2021
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
Filing Date
2/3/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2021
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
2/14/2017
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
2/9/2017
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
2/10/2017
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING NONEARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
12/6/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
11/23/2016
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
12/7/2016
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
11/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2016
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
11/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
10/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
9/12/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
2/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
8/4/2014
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
7/7/2014
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
7/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
6/19/2014
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2014
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/16/2014
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(6)
Filing Date
6/17/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
6/12/2014
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/9/2014
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
Filing Date
6/9/2014
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
6/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2014
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
5/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
5/14/2014
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2011
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2011
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
2/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2011
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
10/19/2010
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
10/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2010
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/13/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
/FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
10/5/2010
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
10/15/2010
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
10/1/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/4/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
9/27/2010
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/1/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2010
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/20/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
8/17/2006
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
7/21/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/19/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
7/13/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2006
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
7/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2006
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
6/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2006
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2006
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
5/3/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM PEORIA JC
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$2,706.35
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$1,851.16
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$262.03
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$209.19
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$105.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Unifund C C R Partners
A: Beverly A Petrone
Amount
$950.86
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified