« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2005-003713
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
7/12/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Rachel Heintz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Board Of Regents, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
David Dir
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2006
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
3/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIEN
Filing Date
2/16/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2006
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum
Docket Date
2/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2006
Description
PRA - Praecipe
Docket Date
2/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2006
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
1/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2006
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
1/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
12/6/2005
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
12/7/2005
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/21/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2005
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
11/9/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2005
Description
TJU - Judgment
Docket Date
7/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM PIMA COUNTY
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/12/2005
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona Board Of Regents, The
A: Rachel Heintz
Amount
$33,631.80
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Satisfied