« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TJ2003-004507
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
9/8/2003
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Transcript Judgment
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cavalry Investments L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Marvin Schenk
Party Name
Antoinette L Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2009
Description
MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear
Docket Date
7/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ANSWER CONCERNINGITS PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
8/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2007
Description
MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear
Docket Date
2/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/9/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2007
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
2/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2007
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
2/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2007
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
1/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2003
Description
TJU - Judgment
Docket Date
9/10/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
2 PAGES CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM SOUTH PHOENIX JUSTICE COURT
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/28/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Date
8/11/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
9/8/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cavalry Investments L L C
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$13,247.23
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
9/8/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cavalry Investments L L C
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$105.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
9/8/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cavalry Investments L L C
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$1,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Modified
Date
9/8/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cavalry Investments L L C
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$299.37
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Modified
Date
9/8/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cavalry Investments L L C
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$6,523.59
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified