« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: TJ2002-000996 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 3/13/2002 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Transcript Judgment  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West   Plaintiff  None  Scott Williams 
Tim Hadrich   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/9/2003  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  4/21/2003   
11/25/2002  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/27/2002   
11/22/2002  WRT - Writ  4/15/2003   
NOTE: OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
10/9/2002  PRA - Praecipe  3/17/2003   
NOTE: WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
7/23/2002  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  7/26/2002   
7/23/2002  WRT - Writ  10/17/2002   
NOTE: OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
5/23/2002  PRA - Praecipe  7/19/2002  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
3/13/2002  DJU - Default Judgment  3/13/2002   
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
  F:U S Collections West  $300.00  One Time  Default Judgment  Satisfied 
  A: Tim Hadrich         
  F:U S Collections West  $80.00  One Time  Default Judgment   
  A: Tim Hadrich         
  F:U S Collections West  $2,487.87  One Time  Default Judgment   
  A: Tim Hadrich         
click here for Law Library Resource Center