Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | TJ1994-000920 | Judge: | Julian, Melissa |
File Date: | 4/7/1994 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Transcript Judgment |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Bhfc Financial Services Inc | Plaintiff | None | Lyndon Steimel |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | Garnishee Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/25/1995 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 6/6/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED | |||
5/5/1995 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 5/15/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/21/1995 | PRA - Praecipe | 3/27/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |||
7/20/1994 | NOT - Notice | 7/22/1994 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: DISMISS W/OUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/7/1994 8:16:00 AM | JUD - Judgment | 4/7/1994 8:16:00 AM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:Bhfc Financial Services Inc | $2,927.84 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Todd A Jostes |