« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
ST1996-000613
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
9/20/1996
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Small Claims Tax
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
John D Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
R L Cohen & Associates
Party Name
Dot Barnett Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
R L Cohen & Associates
Party Name
(3)Maricopa County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
William Knopf
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/1997
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/21/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1997
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
8/22/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/10/1997
Description
WAV - Waiver
Docket Date
2/12/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF RULE 38/SETTING OF CASE FOR TRIAL & EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER
Filing Date
10/30/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/5/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF APPEAL & COMPLAINT & NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
10/2/1996
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/4/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 09-27-96
Filing Date
9/20/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.