« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
ST1995-000155
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
4/18/1995
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Small Claims Tax
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
John D Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
R L Cohen & Associates
Party Name
Dot Barnett Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
R L Cohen & Associates
Party Name
(3)Maricopa County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
William Knopf
Party Name
Maricopa County Assessor
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/1995
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/17/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF APPEAL & COM
Filing Date
7/13/1995
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/17/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAR BY ASSESSOR
Filing Date
7/7/1995
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/11/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1995
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
7/5/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/1995
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
5/12/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/1995
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 042495
Filing Date
4/18/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/19/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.