« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
LC2024-000375
Judge:
LaFave, Julie
File Date:
11/1/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Lower Court Appeals
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
PLF/Appellee
Sex
Attorney
Adolfo Iniguez
Party Name
Jamison Elijah Borrelli
Relationship
DEFT/Appellant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Matthew Maerowitz
Party Name
Surprise Municipal Court
Relationship
Originating Court
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
REC - Receipt
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMAND RETURN
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
NRM - Notice of Remand
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
RDS - Remand Docket Sheet
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
512: Me: Record Appeal Ruling/Remand
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
CM202300782
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
NAL - Notice Appeal Lower Court
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
APPELLANT
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
APPELLEE
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
TRM - Transmittal
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
OF RECORD
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
5/9/2024
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
6/11/2024
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
CDP - Compact Disc Of Proceedings
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
NOTE:
3
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Originating Court(3)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.