« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
LC2021-000237
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
8/26/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Lower Court Appeals
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
T P Racing L L L P
Relationship
PLF/Appellant
Sex
Attorney
Craig Keller
Party Name
Arizona Department Of Gaming
Relationship
DEFT/Appellee
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Ted Vogt
Relationship
DEFT/Appellee
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS/OF ERRATA RE TP RACING LLPS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS/OF ERRATA RE TP RACING LLPS VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/7/2021
Description
901 - ME: Judgment for the LCA case type
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA RE TP RACINGS VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA RE TP RACINGS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
CSA - Complaint Special Action
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/3/2021
Time
15:00
Event
Emergency Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.