Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | LC2021-000180 | Judge: | Hannah, John |
File Date: | 6/30/2021 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Lower Court Appeals |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Phoenix Newspapers Inc | PLF/Appellant | David Bodney | |
Kathy Tulumello | PLF/Appellant | Female | David Bodney |
Arizona State Senate | DEFT/Appellee | Thomas Basile | |
Karen Fann | DEFT/Appellee | Female | Thomas Basile |
Warren Petersen | DEFT/Appellee | Male | Pro Per |
Susan Aceves | DEFT/Appellee | Female | Thomas Basile |
Cyber Ninjas Inc | DEFT/Appellee | John Wilenchik |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/31/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/31/2022 | |
5/24/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/24/2022 | |
5/10/2022 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set | 5/10/2022 | |
4/6/2022 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 4/6/2022 | |
3/22/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/22/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/3/2022 | |
3/2/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/2/2022 | |
1/19/2022 | 053 - ME: Case Consolidation | 1/19/2022 | |
1/18/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 1/18/2022 | |
1/14/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 1/14/2022 | |
1/14/2022 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set | 1/14/2022 | |
1/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/12/2022 | |
NOTE: TO DISQUALIFY JUDICIAL OFFICER FOR CAUSE | |||
1/11/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 1/11/2022 | |
1/11/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/11/2022 | |
1/6/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING RENEWED MOTION TO HOLD CYBER NINJAS IN CONTEMPT FOR ITS FAILURE TO COMPLY | |||
1/6/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/7/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/6/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/7/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
1/6/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/7/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
1/5/2022 | RES - Response | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |||
1/5/2022 | LET - Letter | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
12/30/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/30/2021 | |
12/28/2021 | RES - Response | 12/29/2021 | |
NOTE: TO EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
12/22/2021 | MOT - Motion | 12/23/2021 | |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW/EX PARTE | |||
12/20/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/20/2021 | |
12/17/2021 | REQ - Request | 12/21/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION TO HOLD CYBER NINJAS IN CONTEMPT FOR ITS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS TO PRODUCE PUBLIC RECORDS | |||
12/3/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 12/3/2021 | |
12/3/2021 | NOT - Notice | 12/7/2021 | |
NOTE: OF DECEMBER 1 2021 DECISION | |||
12/2/2021 | ORD - Order | 12/2/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT/ | |||
11/30/2021 | NOT - Notice | 12/2/2021 | |
NOTE: OF DECISION DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CYBER NINJAS APPLICATION FOR STAY | |||
11/30/2021 | ORD - Order | 12/1/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
11/24/2021 | MOT - Motion | 11/24/2021 | |
NOTE: RENEWED/TO HOLD CYBER NINJAS IN CONTEMPT FOR ITS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS TO PRODUCE PUBLIC RECORDS | |||
11/24/2021 | ORD - Order | 11/29/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
11/23/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 11/23/2021 | |
11/15/2021 | RES - Response | 11/18/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
11/12/2021 | REQ - Request | 11/16/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITIED STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
11/10/2021 | REL - Reply | 11/10/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF FINDING OF WAIVER OF LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE | |||
11/10/2021 | RES - Response | 11/10/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR FINDING OF WAIVER OF LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE | |||
11/4/2021 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 11/8/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR FINDING OF WAIVER OF LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE | |||
11/3/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/4/2021 | |
11/3/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 11/4/2021 | |
NOTE: DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION PETITION IN PART | |||
11/3/2021 | RES - Response | 11/4/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR FINDING OF WAIVER | |||
11/1/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 11/1/2021 | |
10/27/2021 | RES - Response | 10/28/2021 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT OF APPEALS ORDER | |||
10/26/2021 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 10/26/2021 | |
10/22/2021 | RES - Response | 10/27/2021 | |
NOTE: TO SENATE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS IN CAMERA AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE 2 REQUEST FOR FINDING OF WAIVER OF LEGISLATIVE PRIVILGE AND 3 RENEWED REQUEST FOR ADEQUATE PRIVILEGE LOG | |||
10/22/2021 | 950 - ME: Sealed - Paper Only Access | 10/22/2021 | |
10/22/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 10/22/2021 | |
NOTE: A SET OF COPIES OF THE SIX RECORDS REVIEWED IN CAMERA, INCLUDING A REDACTED VERSION OF THE RECORD FOUND TO CONTAIN A PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATION | |||
10/22/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 10/22/2021 | |
NOTE: AN UNREDACTED COPY OF THE RECORD FOUND TO CONTAIN A PRIVILEDGED COMMUNICATION | |||
10/21/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/21/2021 | |
10/21/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/21/2021 | |
10/15/2021 | MOT - Motion | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: TO HOLD CYBER NINJAS IN CONTEMPT FOR ITS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS ORDER TO PRODUCE PUBLIC RECORDS | |||
10/12/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 10/12/2021 | |
10/12/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/12/2021 | |
10/12/2021 | NOT - Notice | 10/13/2021 | |
NOTE: OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE | |||
10/11/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 10/11/2021 | |
10/8/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 10/11/2021 | |
10/8/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 10/11/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ORDER ACCEPTING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION, DENYING RELIEF | |||
10/7/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/7/2021 | |
10/1/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/1/2021 | |
9/29/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/1/2021 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO SEPTEMBER 23 2021 ORDER | |||
9/28/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/28/2021 | |
9/24/2021 | REL - Reply | 9/24/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO COMPEL ADEQUATE PRIVILEGE LOG | |||
9/23/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 9/23/2021 | |
9/23/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/23/2021 | |
9/22/2021 | RES - Response | 9/24/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO COMPEL AN ADEQUATE PRIVILEGE LOG | |||
9/20/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/20/2021 | |
9/17/2021 | REP - Report | 9/20/2021 | |
NOTE: SENATE DEFENDANTS STATUS REPORT AND RENEWED MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE | |||
9/16/2021 | MOT - Motion | 9/17/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/FOR PRELIMINARY IN CAMERA REVIEW AND TO COMPEL ADEQUATE PRIVILIGE LOG | |||
9/8/2021 | ORD - Order | 9/9/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
9/2/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 9/2/2021 | |
8/24/2021 | NOT - Notice | 8/24/2021 | |
NOTE: OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |||
8/24/2021 | ORD - Order | 8/25/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PRODUCE PUBLIC RECORDS | |||
8/20/2021 | NOT - Notice | 8/23/2021 | |
NOTE: OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |||
8/17/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 8/17/2021 | |
8/17/2021 | REL - Reply | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SENATE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |||
8/17/2021 | REL - Reply | 8/19/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
8/16/2021 | ORD - Order | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL | |||
8/11/2021 | MOT - Motion | 8/13/2021 | |
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
8/10/2021 | RES - Response | 8/10/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/IN OPPOSITION TO SENATE DEFENDANTS MOTIN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ADN CYBER NINJAS MOTIN TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY INSUPPORT OF THEIR APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
8/3/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 8/9/2021 | |
7/27/2021 | RES - Response | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
7/27/2021 | MOT - Motion | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |||
7/27/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/29/2021 | |
NOTE: ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED | |||
7/27/2021 | RES - Response | 7/29/2021 | |
NOTE: TO APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED | |||
7/23/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/23/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/19/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | ANS - Answer | 7/19/2021 | |
7/15/2021 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 7/15/2021 | |
7/15/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 7/15/2021 | |
7/15/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/16/2021 | |
7/13/2021 | CME - Credit Memo | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: CYBER NINJAS INC | |||
7/13/2021 | REL - Reply | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SENATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE | |||
7/13/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/13/2021 | |
7/12/2021 | RES - Response | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE | |||
7/9/2021 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 7/13/2021 | |
7/8/2021 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 7/13/2021 | |
7/7/2021 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 7/8/2021 | |
7/6/2021 | RES - Response | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO SENATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE BY PHOENIX NEWSPAPER INC AND KATHY TULUMELLO | |||
7/2/2021 | 504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment | 7/2/2021 | |
7/1/2021 | MOT - Motion | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE | |||
7/1/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/6/2021 | |
6/30/2021 | CSA - Complaint Special Action | 6/30/2021 | |
6/30/2021 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 6/30/2021 | |
6/30/2021 | APL - Application | 6/30/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS INC AND KATHY TULUMELLO | |||
6/30/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 6/30/2021 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/14/2021 | 9:30 | Order To Show Cause |
7/21/2021 | 16:00 | Order To Show Cause |
8/23/2021 | 9:30 | Oral Argument |
9/17/2021 | 16:00 | Status Conference |
9/24/2021 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
10/28/2021 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/30/2021 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
1/6/2022 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
1/6/2022 | 9:30 | Order To Show Cause |
1/21/2022 | 11:30 | Status Conference |
1/25/2022 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |