Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | LC2021-000074 | Judge: | Pineda, Susanna |
File Date: | 3/12/2021 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Lower Court Appeals |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Audit-U S A | PLF/Appellant | William Risner | |
Maricopa County | DEFT/Appellee | Joseph La Rue | |
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors | DEFT/Appellee | Joseph La Rue |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/17/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index | 10/18/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
10/17/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 10/18/2022 | |
10/4/2022 | MEM - Memorandum | 10/5/2022 | |
7/15/2022 | MEM - Memorandum | 7/18/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 59 | |||
4/21/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index | 4/22/2022 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
4/21/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 4/22/2022 | |
4/21/2022 | NOT - Notice | 4/22/2022 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
3/31/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 3/31/2022 | |
2/28/2022 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 2/28/2022 | |
2/25/2022 | NOT - Notice | 2/28/2022 | |
NOTE: FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
2/17/2022 | NOT - Notice | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: OF NO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
2/11/2022 | NOT - Notice | 2/17/2022 | |
NOTE: OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
2/7/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 2/7/2022 | |
1/12/2022 | REQ - Request | 1/13/2022 | |
NOTE: FOR COURT REPORTERS ATTENDANCE AT ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
1/10/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 1/10/2022 | |
1/5/2022 | REQ - Request | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
11/8/2021 | REL - Reply | 11/9/2021 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL | |||
10/27/2021 | RES - Response | 10/28/2021 | |
NOTE: OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL | |||
10/15/2021 | MOT - Motion | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: FOROR A NEW TRIAL | |||
10/4/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 10/4/2021 | |
8/4/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/4/2021 | |
7/28/2021 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 7/28/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/19/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | REQ - Request | 7/20/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
5/11/2021 | REQ - Request | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/RENEWAL | |||
5/7/2021 | NOT - Notice | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: OF OUTSTANDING MOTIONS AND HEARINGS THAT NEED TO BE RESET | |||
5/7/2021 | NOT - Notice | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: OF OUTSTANDING MOTIONS AND HEARINGS TO BE SET | |||
4/27/2021 | REL - Reply | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/15/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: VERIFICATION | |||
4/15/2021 | RES - Response | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/12/2021 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 4/12/2021 | |
4/1/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/5/2021 | |
3/22/2021 | REQ - Request | 3/23/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR VOLUNTARY DISQUALIFICATION | |||
3/19/2021 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 3/19/2021 | |
3/18/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/23/2021 | |
3/18/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/23/2021 | |
3/18/2021 | 504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment | 3/18/2021 | |
3/18/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 3/18/2021 | |
3/12/2021 | CSA - Complaint Special Action | 3/12/2021 | |
3/12/2021 | MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing | 3/12/2021 | |
NOTE: OF LAW RE PUBLIC RECORDS | |||
3/12/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 3/12/2021 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/29/2021 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
8/3/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
2/4/2022 | 9:30 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |