« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: LC2011-000734 Judge: Starr, Patricia
File Date: 11/21/2011 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Lower Court Appeals  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Committee For Justice & Fairness ( C J F )   PLF/Appellant    Thomas Irvine 
Arizona Secretary Of States Office   DEFT/Appellee    Colleen Connor 
Ken Bennett   DEFT/Appellee  Male  Colleen Connor 
Amy Chan   DEFT/Appellee  Female  Colleen Connor 
William G Montgomery   DEFT/Appellee  Male  Colleen Connor 
Maricopa County Attorneys Office   DEFT/Appellee    Colleen Connor 
Arizona Citizens Clean Election Commission   DEFT/Appellee    Joseph Kanefield 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/28/2016  NOT - Notice  2/12/2016   
NOTE: EXHIBIT WORKSHEET 
12/1/2015  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit  12/1/2015   
11/30/2015  NOT - Notice  11/30/2015   
NOTE: OF SETTLEMENT 
11/5/2015  087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued  11/5/2015   
11/4/2015  OSC - Order To Show Cause  11/4/2015   
11/3/2015  APL - Application  11/3/2015   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
5/13/2015  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  5/15/2015   
NOTE: MANDATE & OPINION 
5/13/2015  MAN - Order Of Mandate  5/15/2015   
NOTE: VACATED IN PART; REVERSED IN PART 
6/12/2013  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  6/13/2013   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS RECEIPT 
5/7/2013  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  5/8/2013   
NOTE: TRANSMIT RECORD ON APPEAL 
1/28/2013  LET - Letter  1/29/2013   
1/18/2013  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  1/23/2013   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
1/18/2013  AIX - Appeals Index  1/23/2013   
12/10/2012  CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement  12/11/2012   
12/6/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  12/7/2012   
12/3/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  12/3/2012   
11/29/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  11/30/2012   
NOTE: OF MOTION TO INTERVENE 
11/29/2012  NOT - Notice  11/30/2012   
NOTE: OF LODGING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE 
11/29/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/29/2012   
11/29/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed  11/29/2012   
11/28/2012  JUD - Judgment  11/29/2012   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
11/19/2012  STP - Stipulation  11/20/2012   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF REVISED FINAL JUDGMENT 
11/16/2012  RES - Response  11/16/2012   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO INTERVENE 
11/15/2012  STP - Stipulation  11/16/2012   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDMENT 
11/1/2012  MOT - Motion  11/5/2012   
NOTE: TO INTERVENE 
11/1/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/5/2012   
10/30/2012  APL - Application  10/31/2012   
NOTE: FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES 
10/30/2012  NOT - Notice  10/31/2012   
NOTE: OF LODGING FINAL JUDGMENT 
10/11/2012  512: Me: Record Appeal Ruling/Remand  10/11/2012   
10/9/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/9/2012   
7/12/2012  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/12/2012   
5/29/2012  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  5/29/2012   
5/25/2012  ORD - Order  5/29/2012   
NOTE: GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF 
5/22/2012  STA - Statement  5/29/2012  DEFT/Appellee(2)  
NOTE: REPLY BRIEF 
5/21/2012  MOT - Motion  5/29/2012  PLF/Appellant(1)  
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF 
5/3/2012  MOT - Motion  5/4/2012   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED/TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF 
5/2/2012  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  5/2/2012   
5/1/2012  ORD - Order  5/3/2012   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF 
4/25/2012  MOT - Motion  4/26/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATED/TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF 
4/10/2012  NOT - Notice  4/11/2012   
NOTE: OF ERRATA REGARDING COPIES OF THE ANSWERING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS SENT TO THIS COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL 
4/9/2012  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  4/10/2012   
NOTE: APPELLEE 
2/27/2012  NOT - Notice  2/28/2012   
NOTE: APPENDIX 
2/27/2012  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  2/28/2012   
NOTE: APPELLANT - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
1/12/2012  CRR - Certification Of Record On Review - Admin Reviews  1/17/2012   
1/11/2012  NOT - Notice  1/17/2012   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS 
1/5/2012  NOT - Notice  1/9/2012   
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING 
12/23/2011  ANS - Answer  1/4/2012   
12/13/2011  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  12/19/2011   
12/13/2011  NOT - Notice  12/19/2011   
NOTE: OF ACTION 
12/7/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  12/7/2011   
11/21/2011  COM - Complaint  11/22/2011   
11/21/2011  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  11/22/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/8/2012  10:30  Oral Argument 
11/30/2015  10:00  Order To Show Cause 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
11/28/2012  F:Committee For Justice & Fairness ( C J F )  $1,017.07  One Time  Costs   
  A: Arizona Secretary Of States Office         
  A: Ken Bennett         
  A: Amy Chan         
  A: William G Montgomery         
  A: Maricopa County Attorneys Office         
  A: Arizona Citizens Clean Election Commission         
11/28/2012  F:Committee For Justice & Fairness ( C J F )  $49,220.25  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Arizona Secretary Of States Office         
  A: Ken Bennett         
  A: Amy Chan         
  A: William G Montgomery         
  A: Maricopa County Attorneys Office         
  A: Arizona Citizens Clean Election Commission         
click here for Law Library Resource Center