« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: LC2010-000672 Judge: Harris, Myra
File Date: 8/24/2010 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Lower Court Appeals  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West   PLF/Appellee    Alan Zimmerman 
Mark R Berger   DEFT/Appellant  Male  George Tacker 
North Valley Justice Court   Originating Court    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/21/2011  REC - Receipt  9/21/2011   
NOTE: REMAND RETURN 
1/19/2011  ORD - Order  1/19/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES ON APPEAL 
1/13/2011  NRM - Notice of Remand  1/13/2011   
1/13/2011  RDS - Remand Docket Sheet  1/13/2011   
12/20/2010  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  1/13/2011   
12/8/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  12/8/2010   
10/6/2010  504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment  10/6/2010   
9/30/2010  RFP - Receipt Filing Fee Paid  10/5/2010   
NOTE: $208 
9/10/2010  COM - Complaint  9/10/2010  Originating Court(3)  
9/10/2010  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  9/10/2010  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: APPELLANT 
9/10/2010  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  9/10/2010  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: APPELLEE 
9/10/2010  TRM - Transmittal  9/10/2010  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: OF RECORD 
9/10/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/10/2010   
NOTE: CIVIL APPEAL FROM NORTH VALLEY JUSTICE COURT 
8/30/2010  RFT- Request For Transmittal  8/30/2010   
8/24/2010  NOP - Notice of Initial Perfection  8/30/2010  Originating Court(3)  
8/24/2010  NAL - Notice Appeal Lower Court  8/30/2010  Originating Court(3)  
8/24/2010  NFD - Notice Of Filing Fee Due  8/30/2010   
NOTE: 8/30/10 
8/24/2010  RFP - Receipt Filing Fee Paid  8/30/2010   
NOTE: PAID 8/24 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center