« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: LC2009-000778 Judge: Starr, Patricia
File Date: 10/27/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Lower Court Appeals  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West   PLF/Appellant    Alan Zimmerman 
Ana Yadron   DEFT/Appellee  Female  Pro Per 
San Marcos Justice Court   Originating Court    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/3/2010  NRM - Notice of Remand  3/3/2010   
3/3/2010  RDS - Remand Docket Sheet  3/3/2010   
3/2/2010  512: Me: Record Appeal Ruling/Remand  3/2/2010   
1/5/2010  504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment  1/5/2010   
12/21/2009  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  12/23/2009  DEFT/Appellee(2)  
12/21/2009  RFP - Receipt Filing Fee Paid  12/23/2009   
NOTE: $208 
12/1/2009  COM - Complaint  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
12/1/2009  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: APPELLANT 
12/1/2009  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: APPELLEE 
12/1/2009  TRM - Transmittal  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: OF RECORD 
12/1/2009  EXH - Exhibit  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
12/1/2009  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings  12/1/2009  Originating Court(3)  
NOTE: 5/22/2009 
12/1/2009  NOF - Notice Of Filing  12/1/2009   
NOTE: CIVIL CASE FILE FROM SAN MARCOS JUSTICE COURT 
10/28/2009  RFT- Request For Transmittal  10/28/2009   
10/27/2009  NOP - Notice of Initial Perfection  10/28/2009  Originating Court(3)  
10/27/2009  NAL - Notice Appeal Lower Court  10/28/2009  Originating Court(3)  
10/27/2009  NFD - Notice Of Filing Fee Due  10/28/2009   
NOTE: 10/30/09 
10/27/2009  RFP - Receipt Filing Fee Paid  10/28/2009   
NOTE: PAID 10/27 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center