« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: LC2008-000628 Judge: Starr, Patricia
File Date: 9/15/2008 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Lower Court Appeals  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Theresa Cameron   PLF/Appellant  Female  DANIEL BONNETT 
Arizona Board Of Regents   DEFT/Appellee    Daniel Dowd 
Arizona State University   DEFT/Appellee    Daniel Dowd 
Michael Crow   DEFT/Appellee  Male  Daniel Dowd 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/26/2012  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings  11/29/2012   
NOTE: 12/10/08 
11/26/2012  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings  11/29/2012   
NOTE: 9/14/09 
11/21/2012  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  11/27/2012   
11/21/2012  MAN - Order Of Mandate  11/27/2012   
NOTE: AFFIRMED 
9/30/2010  ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt  9/30/2010   
9/24/2010  LET - Letter  9/24/2010   
NOTE: APPEALS 
9/10/2010  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  9/10/2010   
NOTE: TRANSMIT RECORD ON APPEAL BY 09/24/10 
6/29/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  7/2/2010   
6/3/2010  NOT - Notice  6/8/2010   
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL 
5/17/2010  NOT - Notice  5/17/2010   
NOTE: APPELLANTS FILING FEE 
5/17/2010  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  5/17/2010   
5/7/2010  LET - Letter  5/7/2010   
NOTE: APPEALS 
5/7/2010  AIX - Appeals Index  5/7/2010   
4/15/2010  NOT - Notice  4/21/2010   
NOTE: DESIGNATION OF TRANSCRIPT AND NOTICE OF SATISFACTORY ARRANGEMENTS FOR COURT REPORTER PAYMENT 
4/9/2010  CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement  4/13/2010   
3/30/2010  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  3/31/2010   
NOTE: $500.00 
3/29/2010  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/31/2010   
3/24/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed  3/24/2010   
3/1/2010  JUD - Judgment  3/2/2010   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
11/24/2009  NOT - Notice  12/2/2009   
NOTE: OF LODGING PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT 
11/24/2009  SOC - Statement Of Costs  12/2/2009   
11/18/2009  506 - ME: Appeal Dismissed/Remanded  11/18/2009   
9/16/2009  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/16/2009   
9/11/2009  ORD - Order  9/15/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTIO TO REMOVE ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY COMMITTEE ON ACADEMIC FREEDOM AND TENURE AS A NAMED PARTY IN THIS MATTER AND TO REMOVE ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY COMMITTEE ON ACADEMIC FREEDOM AND TENURE FROM CAPTION 
9/4/2009  REL - Reply  9/15/2009   
8/17/2009  ANS - Answer  8/18/2009   
NOTE: OF DEFENDANTS THE ARIZONA BOARD OF REGENTS FOR AND ON BEHALF OF ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY AND MICHAEL M CROW 
8/17/2009  NOT - Notice  8/18/2009   
NOTE: APPENDIX OF DOCUMENTS 
8/17/2009  ORD - Order  8/18/2009   
8/11/2009  STP - Stipulation  8/12/2009   
NOTE: TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS ANSWERING BRIEF AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF 
8/4/2009  MOT - Motion  8/5/2009   
NOTE: TO REMOVE ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY COMMITTEE ON ACADEMIC FREEDOM AND TENURE AS A NAMED PARTY IN THIS MATTER AND TO REMOVE ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY COMMITTEE ON ACADEMIC FREEDOM AND TENURE FROM CAPTION 
7/14/2009  ORD - Order  7/15/2009   
7/8/2009  MOT - Motion  7/10/2009   
NOTE: STIPULATED/TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT DATE 
6/12/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  6/12/2009   
6/8/2009  NOT - Notice  6/9/2009   
NOTE: APPENDIX TO OPENING BRIEF - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
6/8/2009  MCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing  6/9/2009   
NOTE: APPELLANT - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
5/1/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/1/2009   
4/21/2009  STP - Stipulation  4/23/2009   
NOTE: REGARDING CERTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW INDEX OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW AND SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW AS WELL AS STIPULATION REGARDING EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE IN ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS BEFORE CAFT 
4/21/2009  NOF - Notice Of Filing  4/28/2009   
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW INDEX OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW AND SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON REVIEW 
3/20/2009  019 - ME: Ruling  3/20/2009   
2/25/2009  REL - Reply  2/26/2009   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO APELLANTS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
2/12/2009  RES - Response  2/17/2009   
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/APPELLEES MOTION FOR LEAVE AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS MOTIO FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/29/2009  MOT - Motion  2/10/2009   
NOTE: FOR LEAVE AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/20/2009  REL - Reply  1/21/2009   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS/APPELLEES RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/20/2009  REL - Reply  1/21/2009   
NOTE: IN RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS FURTHER BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HER REQUEST FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
1/14/2009  RES - Response  1/20/2009   
NOTE: TO APPELLANTS FURTHER BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HER REQUEST FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
1/14/2009  RES - Response  1/20/2009   
NOTE: TO APPELLANTS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/5/2009  STA - Statement  1/6/2009   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF HER REQUEST FOR STAY OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
1/5/2009  MOT - Motion  1/6/2009   
NOTE: FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/5/2009  DCL - Declaration  1/8/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/OF DANIEL L BONNETT FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/5/2009  MOT - Motion  1/8/2009   
NOTE: FOR CLARIFIATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
1/5/2009  STA - Statement  1/8/2009   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF HER REQUEST FOR STAY OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
12/17/2008  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  12/17/2008   
12/10/2008  ORD - Order  12/18/2008   
NOTE: RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY 
12/10/2008  NOT - Notice  12/11/2008   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS 
12/4/2008  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  12/5/2008   
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY 
11/21/2008  ORD - Order  12/3/2008   
NOTE: TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 
11/19/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue  11/21/2008   
NOTE: ORAL ARGUMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/3/2008 AT 2:15PM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING 
11/17/2008  REL - Reply  11/19/2008   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION FOR DE NOVO IDENTIFICATION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE REQUEST TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST TO CONDUCT EVIDENTIARY HEARING 
11/17/2008  REL - Reply  11/19/2008   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
11/17/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/19/2008   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY 
11/17/2008  ANS - Answer  11/19/2008   
11/10/2008  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/10/2008   
11/4/2008  NOF - Notice Of Filing  11/4/2008   
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON REVIEW INDEX OF RECORD ON REVIEW AND RECORD ON REVIEW 
11/3/2008  RES - Response  11/5/2008   
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION FOR TRIAL DE NOVO IDENTIFICATION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE REQUEST TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST TO CONDUCT EVIDENTIARY HEARING -ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
11/3/2008  REL - Reply  11/4/2008   
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
10/29/2008  ORD - Order  11/4/2008   
10/24/2008  STP - Stipulation  10/27/2008   
NOTE: TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY 
10/15/2008  NOT - Notice  10/17/2008   
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION FOR TRIAL DE NOVO IDENTIFICATION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE REQUEST TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST TO CONDUCT EVIDENTIARY HEARING 
10/15/2008  MOT - Motion  10/17/2008   
NOTE: FOR TRIAL DE NOVO IDENTIFICATION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE REQUEST TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST TO CONDUCT EVIDENTIARY HEARING - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
10/7/2008  MOT - Motion  10/8/2008   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISIONS - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
10/7/2008  NOT - Notice  10/8/2008   
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS/APPELLANTS MOTION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISIONS 
10/1/2008  019 - ME: Ruling  10/1/2008   
9/30/2008  NOT - Notice  10/15/2008   
NOTE: OF SERVICE 
9/26/2008  NOT - Notice  10/2/2008   
NOTE: OF REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD 
9/26/2008  WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons  10/2/2008   
9/26/2008  WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons  10/2/2008   
9/26/2008  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/30/2008   
NOTE: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY 
9/26/2008  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/30/2008   
NOTE: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT MICHAEL CROW 
9/24/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2008   
NOTE: AMENDED 
9/23/2008  NOT - Notice  9/24/2008   
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW ORDER 
9/22/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/22/2008   
9/22/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/24/2008   
9/22/2008  SUM - Summons  9/25/2008   
9/19/2008  MOT - Motion  9/23/2008   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISIONS - ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
9/19/2008  MOT - Motion  9/23/2008   
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT ON PLAINTIFF/APPELLANTS MOTION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT 
9/19/2008  NOT - Notice  9/24/2008   
NOTE: OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS 
9/19/2008  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/24/2008   
NOTE: IN COMPLIANCE WITH ARS 12-904B 
9/19/2008  APL - Application  9/24/2008   
NOTE: FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
9/15/2008  COM - Complaint  9/16/2008   
NOTE: FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW (APPEAL) OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
12/3/2008  14:15  Pre-Hearing Conference 
12/10/2008  15:30  Pre-Hearing Conference 
4/22/2009  15:15  Status Conference 
8/17/2009  10:00  Oral Argument 
9/14/2009  9:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/1/2010  A:     One Time  Judgment Only   
click here for Law Library Resource Center