« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
LC2000-001034
Judge:
Gates, Pamela
File Date:
7/27/2000
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Lower Court Appeals
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Appellant
Sex
Attorney
SAMUEL LESLEY
Party Name
Denny Ray Hemphill
Relationship
Appellee
Sex
Male
Attorney
Gary Kula
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2001
Description
RDS - Remand Docket Sheet
Docket Date
7/21/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2001
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/6/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2001
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/5/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2001
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
7/12/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2001
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/4/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2001
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2000
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/16/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2000
Description
504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment
Docket Date
9/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2000
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/15/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
LWR CRT #5625610 1,2,3; 5625610 1 03-27-99 DUI (ALCOHOL); 2 DUI W BAC OF .10 OR HIGHER; 3 EXTREME DUI W/BAC OF .10 OR HIGHER
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.