« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
LC1993-000160
Judge:
Mikitish, Joseph
File Date:
3/4/1993
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Lower Court Appeals
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Appellee
Sex
Attorney
Donald Jones
Party Name
Scott A Bundgaard
Relationship
Appellant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/1993
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/11/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1993
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/27/1993
Filing Party
Appellant(2)
NOTE:
FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
7/2/1993
Description
RDS - Remand Docket Sheet
Docket Date
7/6/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
6/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/1993
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt
Docket Date
5/24/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/1993
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/18/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/1993
Description
333 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/18/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1993
Description
304 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
4/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/1993
Description
503 - ME: Rec Appeal Assign Oa Set
Docket Date
4/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/1993
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/12/1993
Filing Party
Appellant(2)
Filing Date
3/15/1993
Description
508: Me: Rec Appeal - Memo Due Dates
Docket Date
3/16/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/1993
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
3/26/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMT $16.50
Filing Date
3/4/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/4/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
2871850-OP 10-10-92 DISABLED PARKING; NOTICE/APPEAL ON RECORD 02-26-93; TRANSMITTAL/RECORD--------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CT PLEADINGS---------------------------
Filing Date
3/4/1993
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
3/10/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/1993
Description
TRP - Tape Recording Of Proceedings
Docket Date
7/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/1993
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/1/1993
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.