Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2019-051229 Judge: Thomason, Timothy
File Date: 4/8/2019 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Kadima Ventures L L C   Plaintiff    Brian Mueller 
Shiftypixy Inc   Defendant    DAWN DAUPHINE 
Tim Wales   Counter Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Stacey Wales   Counter Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/5/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/8/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Attorney Within Same Firm 
3/31/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/31/2021   
3/29/2021  RES - Response  3/30/2021   
NOTE: SHIFTPIXY’S RESPONSE TO KADIMA’S ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE KADIMA FINANCIAL INFORMATION 
3/19/2021  STA - Statement  3/22/2021   
NOTE: KADIMA'S ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING THE DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE KADIMA FINANCIAL INFORMATION 
3/12/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/12/2021   
3/8/2021  STA - Statement  3/10/2021   
NOTE: Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute ShiftPixys Attorneys Eyes Only Material 
3/5/2021  STA - Statement  3/8/2021   
NOTE: Rule 26(d) Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute 
1/12/2021  ORD - Order  1/12/2021   
NOTE: approving the Stipulated Motion as follows: 1. Deadline for the parties to disclose identity and opinions of expert witnesses is extended to June 15, 2021; 2. Deadline for the parties to disclose any rebuttal expert opinions is extended to July 15, 2021; 3. Deadline for the parties to complete fact discovery is extended to June 25, 2021; 4. Deadline for each party to provide final supplemental disclosures is extended to August 12, 2021; 5. Deadline for the parties to complete mediation is extended to August 20, 2021; and 6. Deadline for the parties to file all dispositive motions is extended to August 20, 2021. 7. The Trial Setting Conference set for April 23, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is reset to September 17, 2021 at 9:30 a.m.  
1/7/2021  MOT - Motion  1/8/2021   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines 
9/21/2020  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  9/21/2020   
9/21/2020  SCO – Scheduling Order  9/21/2020   
9/21/2020  NOT - Notice  9/22/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment 
8/24/2020  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  8/24/2020   
8/20/2020  ORD - Order  8/20/2020   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE / AND RULE 502 / 
8/18/2020  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  8/19/2020   
NOTE: Joint Report 
8/17/2020  MOT - Motion  8/18/2020   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion for Entry of Potective Order 
8/7/2020  ANS - Answer  8/7/2020   
NOTE: Answer to Counterclaim 
7/16/2020  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/20/2020   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service / TIM WALES AND STACEY WALES 
7/14/2020  ANS - Answer  7/16/2020   
NOTE: Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim 
7/14/2020  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  7/16/2020   
NOTE: Certificate of Agreement Re Compulsory Arbitration 
3/12/2020  ORD - Order  3/12/2020   
NOTE: APPROVING THE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 
3/9/2020  STP - Stipulation  3/11/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint 
12/20/2019  ORD - Order  12/20/2019   
NOTE: Defendant shall have until March 13, 2020, to file its motion to stay and compel arbitration. Defendant shall have twenty (20) days after a ruling is entered resolving Defendants anticipated motion to stay and compel arbitration in which to respond to the Complaint, whether by answer or a Rule 12 motion. By entering into the Stipulation, Defendant shall not be deemed to have waived any rights, including, without limitation, its right to seek to stay this action and/or compel arbitration of this matter 
12/19/2019  OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar  12/19/2019   
12/17/2019  STP - Stipulation  12/18/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint 
12/16/2019  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  12/18/2019   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Continue on the Inactive Calendar 
12/6/2019  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  12/6/2019   
12/2/2019  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  12/4/2019   
NOTE: Ex Parte Application of Withdrawal with Client Consent of Co-Counsel Baker & Hostetler LLP 
11/13/2019  NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar  11/13/2019   
10/30/2019  ORD - Order  10/30/2019   
NOTE: approving the Stipulation. Defendant shall have until January 31, 2020, to file its motion to stay and compel arbitration. Defendant shall have twenty (20) days after a ruling is entered resolving Defendants anticipated motion to stay and compel arbitration in which to respond to the Complaint, whether by answer or a Rule 12 motion. By entering into the Stipulation, Defendant shall not be deemed to have waived any rights, including, without limitation, its right to seek to stay this action and/or compel arbitration of this matter 
10/28/2019  STP - Stipulation  10/29/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint 
8/13/2019  ORD - Order  8/13/2019   
NOTE: approving the Stipulation. Defendant shall have until October 31, 2019, to file its motion to stay and compel arbitration. Defendant shall have twenty (20) days after a ruling is entered resolving Defendant’s anticipated motion to stay and compel arbitration in which to respond to the Complaint, whether by answer or a Rule 12 motion. By entering into the Stipulation, Defendant shall not be deemed to have waived any rights, including, without limitation, its right to seek to stay this action and/or compel arbitration of this matter 
8/8/2019  STP - Stipulation  8/9/2019   
NOTE: WARD’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
5/21/2019  ORD - Order  5/21/2019   
NOTE: approving the Stipulation. Defendant shall have until August 9, 2019, to file its motion to stay and compel arbitration. Defendant shall have twenty (20) days after a ruling is entered resolving Defendant’s anticipated motion to stay and compel arbitration in which to respond to the Complaint, whether by answer or a Rule 12 motion. By entering into the Stipulation, Defendant shall not be deemed to have waived any rights, including, without limitation, its right to seek to stay this action and/or compel arbitration of this matter 
5/17/2019  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  5/17/2019   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE PRO HAC VICE RE MICHAEL STEVEN GORDON 
5/16/2019  STP - Stipulation  5/17/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Second Request) 
5/15/2019  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  5/16/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Pro Hac Vice re Michael Steven Gordon 
5/9/2019  NOT - Notice  5/9/2019   
NOTE: Notice Required by Case Reassignment Order 
5/1/2019  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  5/1/2019   
4/30/2019  ORD - Order  4/30/2019   
NOTE: approving the Stipulation. Defendant shall have until May 20, 2019, to file its motion to stay and compel arbitration. Defendant shall have twenty (20) days after a ruling is entered resolving Defendant’s anticipated motion to stay and compel arbitration in which to respond to the Complaint, whether by answer or a Rule 12 motion. By entering into the Stipulation, Defendant shall not be deemed to have waived any rights, including, without limitation, its right to seek to stay this action and/or compel arbitration of this matter 
4/26/2019  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  4/26/2019   
4/26/2019  STP - Stipulation  4/29/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint 
4/25/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  4/25/2019   
4/25/2019  ORD - Order  4/25/2019   
NOTE: TRANSFERRING CASE TO COMMERCIAL COURT 
4/22/2019  MOT - Motion  4/23/2019   
NOTE: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case to Commercial Court 
4/11/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/16/2019   
4/8/2019  COM - Complaint  4/12/2019   
4/8/2019  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  4/12/2019   
4/8/2019  CSH - Coversheet  4/12/2019   
4/8/2019  CSH - Coversheet  4/12/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/18/2020  11:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
3/11/2021  11:00  Oral Argument 
4/23/2021  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
9/17/2021  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file