« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-090753
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Coffey
File Date:
2/5/2024
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
John McGee
Party Name
Cassandra C Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Alternative Method of Service
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet System Generated
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons Cassandra C Hemphill System Generated
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons John/jane Doe Hemphill System Generated
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.