« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-036802
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Minder
File Date:
12/17/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Capital One N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Todd Gurstel
Party Name
Jamison E Borrelli
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2025
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Dismissal without Prejudice
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JAMISON E BORRELLI AND J DOE
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER AUTHORIZING ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE AND ALTERNATIVE OR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALTERNATIVE OR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.