« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-018789
Judge:
Julian, Melissa
File Date:
7/17/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Make Elections Fair
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Ben Toma
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Warren Petersen
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Mitzi Epstein
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Shawnna Bolick
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Sonny Borrelli
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Brian Fernandez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Sine Kerr
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Juan Mendez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Lupe Contreras
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Travis Grantham
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Nancy Gutierrez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Teresa Martinez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Quang Nguyen
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brunn Roysden
Party Name
Stephanie Stahl Hamilton
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Adrian Fontes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Free Enterprise Club
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
ANDREW GOULD
Party Name
Susan Garvey
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
ANDREW GOULD
Party Name
Kathleen Liles
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
ANDREW GOULD
Party Name
John Shadegg
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
ANDREW GOULD
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECISION ORDER
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MANDATE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM ARIZONA SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE HONORABLE REBECCA WHITE BERCH JUSTICE OF THE ARIZONA SUPREME COURT IS DESIGNATED TO SIT ON THE CASE UNTIL ITS FINALLY DETERMINED
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
901 - ME: Judgment
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL EFILE BILLING $100
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Legislative Democrats Notice of Waiver of Appearance
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -AND- RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEGISLATIVE DEMOCRATS' RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / CO-CHG $245.00 R#
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND RESPONSE TO COMMITTEE’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE / PAID $333 REC # 29873985
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL’S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CO-CHG $245.00 R# 29859751
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service / ADRIAN FONTES
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/19/2024
Time
15:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
8/9/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Election Challenge
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status