« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-010397
Judge:
Kaiser, Brian
File Date:
5/1/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Skyler Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
OCN - Order Change of Name
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CHANGING NAME OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
WAV - Waiver
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
NON PETITIONING PARENTAL / OF NOTICE
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Hearing
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
WAV - Waiver
Docket Date
6/19/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MARITAL / OF NOTICE
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
New Notice of Hearing
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Hearing
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/21/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Name Change Hearing
Date
6/26/2024
Time
14:30
Event
Name Change Hearing
Date
7/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Name Change Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.