« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-000943
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
1/16/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Wholesale Auction Homes L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
SCOTT WILLIAMS
Party Name
Ahmad T Soughar
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Irene Montoya
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jason Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
12/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
12/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGEMENT
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
RWT – Return of Writ
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNSATISFIED
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
WRE - Writ Of Restitution
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2024
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
5/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONTINUING FEE DEFERRAL
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
PRA - Praecipe
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WRIT OF RESTITUTION
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT EVICTION ACTION
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS, WITH SUPPORTING DECLARATION
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AHMAD T SOUGHAR, JOHN AND JANE DOES
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT EVICTION ACTION
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Forcible Detainer Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
2/1/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Wholesale Auction Homes L L C
A: Ahmad T Soughar
Amount
$1,500.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
2/1/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Wholesale Auction Homes L L C
A: Ahmad T Soughar
Amount
$408.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
2/1/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Wholesale Auction Homes L L C
A: Ahmad T Soughar
Amount
$4,084.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Rent
Status