« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-051479
Judge:
Coffey, Rodrick
File Date:
4/25/2023
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
We The People Arizona Alliance
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Charles Johnson
Party Name
Stephen Richer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Rey Valenzuela
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Scott Jarrett
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Maricopa County Recorders Office
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors Elections Division
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Bill Gates
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Clint Hickman
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Jack Sellers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Thomas Galvin
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Steve Gallardo
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT NOTICE PURSUANT TO THE COURT’S JANUARY 3, 2024 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
12/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 42.1 Notice of Change of Judge AS A MATTER OF RIGHT
Filing Date
12/21/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF WE THE PEOPLE ARIZONA ALLIANCE’S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION TO SECURE ACCESS TO PUBLIC RECORDS FROM DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE RE TRIAL SCHEDULE
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF WE THE PEOPLE ARIZONA ALLIANCE’S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF WE THE PEOPLE ARIZONA ALLIANCE’S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT IN SPECIAL ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure statement
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER’S RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
7/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Filing Date
7/23/2023
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 7.1(h) GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION / CO-CHG $245.00 R# 29260400
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JACK SELLERS
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS GALVIN
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEVE GALLARDO
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REY VALENZUELA
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHEN RICHER
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY RECORDER
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
BILL GATES
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLINT HICKMAN
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/26/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/2/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.