« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-051203
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
4/3/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Bayern Industries L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
William Kozub
Party Name
A Z Custom Bottled Water L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Hiru Corporation
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED the foregoing matter is hereby dismissed, without prejudice.
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
HIRU CORPORATION
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AZ CUSTOM BOTTLED WATER LLC
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.