Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2023-013015 | Judge: | Coury, Christopher |
File Date: | 8/24/2023 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Trulieve Cannabis Corp | Plaintiff | Jeffrey Matura | |
Harvest Health & Recreation L L C | Plaintiff | Jeffrey Matura | |
Randy Taylor Consulting L L C | Plaintiff | Jeffrey Matura | |
Yourway Cannabis Brands Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Labtronix Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Yourway Cottonwood L L C | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Natures Wonder L L C | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Healing Resources And Consulting Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Randall Uberecken | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
C T W W W, L L C | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Daniel Hirchak | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Y D D, L L C | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Bianca Finocchiaro | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/14/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/19/2023 | |
NOTE: C T W W W,, L L C | |||
9/14/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/19/2023 | |
NOTE: RANDALL UBERECKEN | |||
9/12/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 9/18/2023 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY YOURWAY CANNABIS BRANDS, INC., LABTRONIX, INC., AND YOURWAY COTTONWOOD, LLC | |||
8/31/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/11/2023 | |
NOTE: BIANCA FINOCCHIARO | |||
8/31/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/11/2023 | |
NOTE: DANIEL HIRCHAK | |||
8/31/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/11/2023 | |
NOTE: YDD LLC | |||
8/31/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/11/2023 | |
NOTE: NATURES WONDER INC | |||
8/24/2023 | COM - Complaint | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint | |||
8/24/2023 | CSH - Coversheet | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
8/24/2023 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/24/2023 | SUM - Summons | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |