Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2023-004832 | Judge: | Cooper, Katherine |
File Date: | 3/30/2023 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Arizona Democratic Party | Plaintiff | Roy Herrera | |
Lisa Sanor | Plaintiff | Female | Roy Herrera |
No Labels | Defendant | DAVID ROSENBAUM | |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Craig Morgan |
Apache County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Celeste Robertson | |
Cochise County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Christine Roberts | |
Coconino County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Heather Mosher | |
Gila County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Jefferson Dalton | |
Graham County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Jean Roof | |
Greenlee County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
La Paz County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | JASON MITCHELL | |
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Mohave County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Navajo County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Jason Moore | |
Navajo County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Pima County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Daniel Jurkowitz | |
Pinal County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | James Mitchell | |
Santa Cruz County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Yavapai County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Thomas Stoxen | |
Yuma County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | William Kerekes |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/17/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/17/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS’ REPLY MEMORANDA IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
5/8/2023 | RES - Response | 5/9/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
5/5/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/7/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
5/4/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
5/2/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 5/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service for La Paz County Board of Supervisors | |||
5/2/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 5/3/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR LA PAZ COUNTY | |||
4/28/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/29/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/27/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/25/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/3/2023 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS | |||
4/25/2023 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 4/25/2023 | |
NOTE: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS / Santa Cruz County Board Of Supervisors | |||
4/24/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/25/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF APACHE COUNTY AND NOTICE OF NOMINAL PARTY STATUS | |||
4/22/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/22/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/22/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/22/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/21/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/21/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, AND NOTICE OF NOMINAL PARTY STATUS | |||
4/21/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service for Gila County Board of Supervisors / Gila County Board Of Supervisors | |||
4/21/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/22/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ASSERTION OF NOMINAL PARTY STATUS; REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF ANSWER AND APPEARANCE | |||
4/20/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance and Notice of Nominal Party Status | |||
4/20/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/19/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/19/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/19/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: Defendant No Labels' Motion to Dismiss | |||
4/19/2023 | DCL - Declaration | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF DAVID B. ROSENBAUM | |||
4/19/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: Defendant Arizona Secretary of State Adrian Fontes' Motion to Dismiss | |||
4/19/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DEFENDANT YUMA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS | |||
4/18/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/19/2023 | |
NOTE: PIMA COUNTY RECORDER’S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND STATEMENT OF NO POSITION | |||
4/17/2023 | ANS - Answer | 4/18/2023 | |
NOTE: MOHAVE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER / CO-CHG $245.00 R# 29218514 | |||
4/13/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/13/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Coconino County Board of Supervisors / Coconino County Board of Supervisors | |||
4/5/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance / CO-CHG $245 29200072 | |||
4/4/2023 | 504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment | 4/4/2023 | |
4/4/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: YAVAPAI COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISOR’S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
4/4/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service for Apache County Board of Supervisors | |||
4/4/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service BY DEFENDANT Cochise County Board of Supervisors | |||
4/4/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DEFENDANT GRAHAM COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS | |||
4/4/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service BY DEFENDANT Mohave County Board of Supervisors | |||
4/4/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service for Greenlee County Board of Supervisors / GREENLEE COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Adrian Fontes / Adrian Fontes | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Navajo County Board of Supervisors | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant No Labels | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Pima County Board of Supervisors | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Pinal County Board of Supervisors | |||
3/31/2023 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service by Defendant Yavapai County Board of Supervisors | |||
3/30/2023 | COM - Complaint | 3/30/2023 | |
3/30/2023 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/30/2023 | |
3/30/2023 | CSH - Coversheet | 3/30/2023 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |