Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2023-004729 | Judge: | McCoy, M. Scott |
File Date: | 3/28/2023 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
![]() |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
City Of Phoenix | Plaintiff | Jean Cabou | |
City Of Tempe | Defendant | John Kerkorian |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/14/2023 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 9/14/2023 | |
9/8/2023 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 9/12/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD | |||
8/29/2023 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/29/2023 | |
7/17/2023 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/17/2023 | |
7/10/2023 | REL - Reply | 7/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Ariz. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) | |||
6/28/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 6/29/2023 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
6/19/2023 | RES - Response | 6/19/2023 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Response to City of Tempe's Motion to Dismiss | |||
6/2/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 6/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
6/1/2023 | NOT - Notice | 6/2/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Outstanding Motions | |||
5/26/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 5/26/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Ariz. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Oral Argument Requested | |||
5/19/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/19/2023 | |
NOTE: BLUEBIRD DEVELOPMENT LLC’S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE | |||
5/17/2023 | 325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation | 5/17/2023 | |
5/17/2023 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 5/17/2023 | |
5/16/2023 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 5/16/2023 | |
5/8/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/9/2023 | |
NOTE: BLUEBIRD DEVELOPMENT LLC’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE | |||
4/24/2023 | RES - Response | 4/24/2023 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX’S RESPONSE TO BLUEBIRD DEVELOPMENT LLC’S MOTION TO INTERVENE | |||
4/5/2023 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 4/5/2023 | |
NOTE: BLUEBIRD DEVELOPMENT LLCS MOTION TO INTERVENE / efile billing $333 | |||
4/3/2023 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 4/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Waiver of Service | |||
3/28/2023 | COM - Complaint | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint | |||
3/28/2023 | CSH - Coversheet | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
3/28/2023 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
3/28/2023 | SUM - Summons | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
3/28/2023 | MOT - Motion | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion to Designate as a Complex Case |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/25/2023 | 9:15 | Oral Argument |
8/17/2023 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |