« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-002970
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
2/24/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Irene Montoya
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jason Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Ahmad Soughar
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2025
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
5/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ FINAL RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT AND NOTICE
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Filing Date
1/20/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/31/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
12/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/19/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO
MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER
AND TO ADDRESS
NONCOMPLIANCE
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO MODIFY
SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO ADDRESS
NONCOMPLIANCE
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF NON-EXPERT WITNESS AND SUBPEONA
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STAY
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO STAY CIVIL
PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF
RELATED APPEAL
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT F
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S OFFER OF JUDGEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 68
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion for Emergency preliminary Injunction
(request for Expedited Court’s intervention)
&
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
OF MOTION TO DISMISS
&
Request for Oral Argument
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/15/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion for Emergency preliminary
Injunction
(request for Court intervention)
&
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE
Filing Date
9/8/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Ahmad Soughar’s response to
Plaintiff’s motion to Strike Motion to
reconsider the Motion to dismiss.
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion requesting oral argument on
motion for reconsideration of the
motion to dismiss the case
Filing Date
8/24/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/26/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBIT A TO PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO DISMISS, AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
8/7/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion requesting Status conference
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE
AND
IN THE ALTERATIVE DIRECT
DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH RULES
AND PROCEDURE TO PROPERLY FILE
A COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE
AND
IN THE ALTERNATIVE DIRECT
DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH RULE
AND PROCEDURE TO PROPERLY FILE
A COUNTERCLAIM.
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
defendant's Response to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
CLM - Claim
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Counter claim & Sanctions
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS -ANDMOTION TO DISMISS OR IN ALTERNATIVE CLARIFY
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND IS DENIED
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Answer
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Answer
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPLICATION and AFFIDAVIT for DEFAULT
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(2)
NOTE:
APPLICATION and AFFIDAVIT for DEFAULT
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO LAWSUIT
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion to extend time to answer Lawsuit
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO LAWSUIT
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AHMAD SOUGHAR
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Amended Complaint
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/3/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/19/2023
Time
11:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/7/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/11/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/19/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/16/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/1/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/2/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.