« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-000629
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
1/13/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jason Valasek
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Brent Felix
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION FOR FILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPLICATION and AFFIDAVIT For DEFAULT
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRENT FELIX
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
brent felix
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MORE TIME TO SERVE OTHER PARTY
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Non-Service
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SERVE BY PUBLICATION AND OTHER ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.