Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-095403 | Judge: | Thompson, Peter |
File Date: | 12/9/2022 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Kari Lake | Plaintiff | Female | Bryan Blehm |
Stephen Richer | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Bill Gates | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Clint Hickman | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Jack Sellers | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Thomas Galvin | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Steve Gallardo | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Scott Jarrett | Defendant | Male | Thomas Liddy |
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Thomas Liddy | |
Paul Andrew Mitchell | Intervenor | Male | Pro Per |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Craig Morgan |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/31/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/31/2023 | |
5/30/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/30/2023 | |
5/26/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/26/2023 | |
5/25/2023 | RES - Response | 5/25/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO FOR SANCTIONS | |||
5/24/2023 | STA - Statement | 5/24/2023 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR KATIE HOBBS'S STATEMENT OF JOINDER | |||
5/24/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/24/2023 | |
5/24/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Motion for Sanctions | |||
5/24/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Judgment | |||
5/24/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/24/2023 | |
NOTE: CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
5/24/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FORMS OF JUDGMENT | |||
5/23/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/23/2023 | |
NOTE: SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES’ JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
5/22/2023 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 5/22/2023 | |
5/19/2023 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 5/19/2023 | |
5/18/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/18/2023 | |
5/17/2023 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/17/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES' MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS TESTIMONY | |||
5/17/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/17/2023 | |
5/16/2023 | RES - Response | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion | |||
5/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER; AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | |||
5/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER; AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | |||
5/16/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Joint Disclosure of Exhibits | |||
5/16/2023 | STA - Statement | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Disclosure of Exhibits | |||
5/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR WITNESS APPEARANCE BY ZOOM | |||
5/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State Adrian Fontes' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Testimony | |||
5/16/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/16/2023 | |
5/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/17/2023 | |
NOTE: Governor Katie Hobbs's Joinder in Secretary's Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony | |||
5/15/2023 | REQ - Request | 5/15/2023 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR KATIE HOBBS’S REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
5/15/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/15/2023 | |
NOTE: REGARDING REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
5/15/2023 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 5/15/2023 | |
5/15/2023 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 5/16/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION AND DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |||
5/12/2023 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 5/12/2023 | |
5/12/2023 | STA - Statement | 5/13/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Statement | |||
5/11/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT | |||
5/11/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS | |||
5/11/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE OPPOSING DAVID MAST'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF | |||
5/11/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
5/11/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: Governor Katie Hobbs's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss | |||
5/11/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
5/11/2023 | STA - Statement | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |||
5/11/2023 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT | |||
5/11/2023 | NOT - Notice | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice Of Disclosure of Experts | |||
5/10/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS | |||
5/10/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT | |||
5/10/2023 | RES - Response | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State Adrian Fontes' Response Objecting to Kari Lake's Motion for Relief from Judgment | |||
5/10/2023 | RES - Response | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR KATIE HOBBS'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT | |||
5/10/2023 | RES - Response | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE OPPOSING DAVID MAST'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF | |||
5/10/2023 | RES - Response | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Response Opposing Lake's Motion for Relief From Judgment | |||
5/10/2023 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL AND RENEWED MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
5/9/2023 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: REGARDING AMENDED MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL | |||
5/9/2023 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: RGARDING AMENED MOTIO TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL | |||
5/9/2023 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/9/2023 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State Adrian Fontes' Supplemental Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
5/9/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Governor Katie Hobbs's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Count III | |||
5/9/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF DAVID MAST IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE'S ELECTION CONTEST | |||
5/9/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | |||
5/9/2023 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/9/2023 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Memorandum of Law Supplementing Their Motion to Dismiss | |||
5/8/2023 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 5/8/2023 | |
5/5/2023 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 5/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Supreme Court Mandate Remanding to the Superior Court | |||
5/5/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Supreme Court | |||
5/5/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Supreme Court | |||
5/5/2023 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 5/5/2023 | |
5/4/2023 | MOT - Motion | 5/4/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
3/28/2023 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 3/29/2023 | |
3/25/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/25/2023 | |
3/24/2023 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/24/2023 | |
3/23/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/23/2023 | |
2/21/2023 | APL - Application | 2/21/2023 | |
NOTE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES (WITH CLIENT CONSENT) | |||
2/13/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 2/14/2023 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
2/13/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index | 3/24/2023 | |
2/1/2023 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 2/1/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
2/1/2023 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 2/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
1/31/2023 | MEM - Memorandum | 2/1/2023 | |
1/26/2023 | ORD - Order | 1/27/2023 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
1/17/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/17/2023 | |
1/11/2023 | NOT - Notice | 1/11/2023 | |
NOTE: RULE 11(c)(3) NOTICE | |||
1/10/2023 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Within Firm | |||
1/4/2023 | ORD - Order | 1/5/2023 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
1/3/2023 | ORD - Order | 1/12/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
1/3/2023 | NOT - Notice | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer | |||
1/3/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 1/4/2023 | |
12/30/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/30/2022 | |
12/30/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 1/3/2023 | |
12/30/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
12/30/2022 | NOT - Notice | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
12/28/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 12/28/2022 | |
12/28/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 12/28/2022 | |
NOTE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
12/27/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/27/2022 | |
12/27/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/27/2022 | |
12/27/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
12/26/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR-ELECT KATIE HOBBS’S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND JOINDER IN MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ MEMORANDUM AND POINTS OF AUTHORITY | |||
12/26/2022 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Governor-Elect Katie Hobbs' Partial Attorney Fee Application | |||
12/26/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Sanctions and Application for Attorneys' Fees | |||
12/26/2022 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Alexis Danneman Declaration in Support of Fee Application | |||
12/26/2022 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Abha Khanna Declaration in Support of Partial Fee Application | |||
12/26/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ JOINDER IN MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
12/26/2022 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses | |||
12/26/2022 | RES - Response | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Kari Lake's Response to Defendant's Motions to for Sanctions and Application for Attorney's Fees | |||
12/26/2022 | RES - Response | 12/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Kari Lake's Corrected Response to Defendants' Motions for Sanctions and Application for Attorneys' Fees | |||
12/26/2022 | APL - Application | 12/29/2022 | Intervenor(11) |
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE | |||
12/24/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 12/24/2022 | |
12/23/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/29/2022 | |
12/22/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/22/2022 | |
12/22/2022 | LET - Letter | 12/27/2022 | |
12/22/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 12/22/2022 | |
12/21/2022 | RES - Response | 12/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS RICHARD BARIS | |||
12/21/2022 | RES - Response | 12/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE UNDER RULE 807 | |||
12/21/2022 | RES - Response | 12/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPET WITNESS CLAY PARIKH | |||
12/20/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/20/2022 | |
12/20/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/20/2022 | |
12/20/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena to Appear | |||
12/20/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion in Limine Regarding Lake's Rule 807 Notice | |||
12/20/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Contestee Katie Hobb's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Experts Clay Parikh and Richard Baris and Strike Expert Reports | |||
12/20/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Katie Hobbs Joinder to County and Secretary Motion Regarding Lakes 807 Notice | |||
12/20/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE’S AND MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF’S EXPERTS CLAY PARIKH AND RICHARD BARIS AND STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS | |||
12/20/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Rule 807 Notice | |||
12/19/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO SEQUESTER BALLOTS EXAMINED BY PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT | |||
12/19/2022 | MTQ - Motion To Quash | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS'S JOINDER IN MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR APPEARANCE AT HEARING | |||
12/19/2022 | REQ - Request | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS'S REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
12/19/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel | |||
12/19/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel | |||
12/19/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel | |||
12/19/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel | |||
12/19/2022 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/19/2022 | |
12/19/2022 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 12/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion TO QUASH | |||
12/18/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Contestee Katie Hobbs's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss | |||
12/18/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Special Action and Verified Statement of Election Contest | |||
12/18/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss | |||
12/18/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Designation and Disclosure of Witnesses | |||
12/18/2022 | RES - Response | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN RICHER'S MOTION TO QUASH | |||
12/18/2022 | RES - Response | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Kari Lake’s Response to Defendant Secretary of State Katie Hobbs’ Motion to Quash Subpoena for Appearance at Hearing | |||
12/18/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff’s Supplemental Designation and Disclosure of Witnesses | |||
12/17/2022 | RES - Response | 12/17/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF KARI LAKE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO DISMISS1 | |||
12/17/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/17/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits | |||
12/17/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/17/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS | |||
12/17/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/17/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF | |||
12/17/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Quash Subpoena for Appearance at Hearing | |||
12/16/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | |||
12/16/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
12/16/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Expedited Discovery | |||
12/16/2022 | RES - Response | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’S RESPONSE TO PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL | |||
12/16/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | RES - Response | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Order to Inspect Ballots | |||
12/16/2022 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: $300.00 / KARI LAKE | |||
12/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice Regarding the Inspectors of the Ballots | |||
12/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF BOND AND DESIGNATION OF PLAINTIFF’S REPRESENTATIVE FOR BALLOT INSPECTION | |||
12/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE’S NOTICE OF PARTIAL JOINDER IN MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CLARIFY ORDER TO INSPECT BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO MARICOPA COUNTY’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CLARIFY ORDER TO INSPECT BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO MARICOPA COUNTY’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CLARIFY ORDER TO INSPECT BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | RES - Response | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion to Expedite Discovery | |||
12/16/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | RES - Response | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CLARIFY | |||
12/16/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO MARICOPA COUNTY’S OPPISTION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY | |||
12/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’S NOTICE REGARDING THE INSPECTORS OF THE BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CONTESTEE KATIE HOBBS’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY | |||
12/16/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | MTQ - Motion To Quash | 12/17/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Quash Subpoena of Stephen Richer | |||
12/16/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CLARIFY REQUEST IN VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS | |||
12/16/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/21/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/21/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/21/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/21/2022 | |
12/15/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/22/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEED PAGE LIMITS | |||
12/15/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Amended Motion to Associate Counsel | |||
12/15/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice - Abha Khanna | |||
12/15/2022 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Pro Hac Vice - Lalitha D. Madduri | |||
12/15/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss | |||
12/15/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits | |||
12/15/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Rule 7.1(h) Ariz. R. Civ. P. | |||
12/15/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County's Defendants' Rule 7.1(h) Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
12/15/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State's Objection to Verified Amended Petition to Inspect Ballots | |||
12/15/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT IN SPECIAL ACTION AND VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: STEPHEN RICHER | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: KATIE HOBBS | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: SCOTT JARRETT | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: BILL GATES | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: JACK SELLERS | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: THOMAS GALVIN | |||
12/14/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO | |||
12/14/2022 | RES - Response | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY’S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER’S VERIFIED PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 16-677 | |||
12/14/2022 | PTT - Petition | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 16-677 | |||
12/14/2022 | RES - Response | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County's Response to Petitioner's Amended Verified Petition to Inspect Ballots | |||
12/14/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO MARICOPA COUNTY’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 16-677 | |||
12/14/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: HELEN PURCELL'S AND TAMMY PATRICK’'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF | |||
12/14/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: HELEN PURCELL'S AND TAMMY PATRICK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI CURIAE BRIEF | |||
12/14/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/14/2022 | |
12/14/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/14/2022 | |
12/13/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED PETITION TO INSPECT BALLOTS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 16-677 | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: STEPHEN RICHER | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: BILL GATES | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: JACK SELLERS | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: SCOTT JARRETT | |||
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: KATIE HOBBS | |||
12/13/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 12/13/2022 | |
12/13/2022 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/13/2022 | |
12/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2022 | |
NOTE: THOMAS GALVIN | |||
12/13/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice of Appearance | |||
12/12/2022 | EXH - Exhibit | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: EXHIBITS TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ATTACHMENTS A AND C OF CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: TO SUPPLEMENT ATTACHMNETS A AN DC OF CONTESTANT/PLNTIFFS COMLAIT IN SPECIAL ACTION AD VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST PURSUANT TO ARS 16-672 | |||
12/12/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
12/12/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING CONTESTANT-PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED EX PARTE MOTION TO STRIKE AND SUBSTITUTE ATTACHMENT C | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED EX PARTE / TO STRIKE AND SUBSTITUTE ATTACHMENT C TO CONTESTANT / PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IN SPECIAL ACTION AND VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST | |||
12/12/2022 | EXH - Exhibit | 12/12/2022 | |
12/12/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING | |||
12/12/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/12/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING CONTESTANT-PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ATTACHMENTS A AND C OF CONTESTANT/PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IN SPECIAL ACTION AND VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST PURSUANT TO ARS 16-672 | |||
12/9/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/9/2022 | |
12/9/2022 | COM - Complaint | 12/9/2022 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/13/2022 | 11:00 | Order To Show Cause |
12/19/2022 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
12/21/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
12/22/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
5/8/2023 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
5/12/2023 | 9:00 | Hearing |
5/17/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/18/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/19/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |