Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-093889 | Judge: | Thompson, Peter |
File Date: | 8/31/2022 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Peggy McClain | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Katherine Hoffman | Defendant | Female | Joshua Bendor |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/17/2022 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 11/17/2022 | |
10/10/2022 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 10/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/22/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/24/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss | |||
9/14/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/17/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/13/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/16/2022 | |
NOTE: KATHERINE HOFFMAN ARIZONA SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION | |||
9/1/2022 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/7/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MANDATORY INJUNCTION | |||
8/31/2022 | COM - Complaint | 9/2/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
8/31/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 9/2/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
8/31/2022 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 9/2/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
11/17/2022 | F:Peggy McClain | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Katherine Hoffman |