Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-053927 | Judge: | Julian, Melissa |
File Date: | 12/9/2022 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Mark Finchem | Plaintiff | Male | Daniel McCauley |
Jeff Zink | Plaintiff | Male | Daniel McCauley |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Craig Morgan |
Katie Hobbs | Defendant | Female | Amy CHAN |
Daniel J McCauleey | Endorsement Case | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/2/2023 | NOT - Notice | 8/11/2023 | |
NOTE: CERTIFIFIED COPY OF ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL IS INCLUDED HEREWITH IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED AND NUMBERED CAUSE | |||
6/29/2023 | NOT - Notice | 7/11/2023 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLEKR NOTICE | |||
6/29/2023 | REC - Receipt | 7/11/2023 | |
NOTE: CTC TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
6/29/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index | 7/11/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
6/14/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 6/15/2023 | |
6/14/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index | 6/15/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
6/5/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 6/6/2023 | |
6/1/2023 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 6/2/2023 | |
6/1/2023 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 6/2/2023 | |
5/31/2023 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 5/31/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / EFILE BILLING $100.00 | |||
5/30/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/30/2023 | |
5/26/2023 | JUD - Judgment | 5/26/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
4/27/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/28/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UPDATE TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |||
4/1/2023 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Objection to Plaintiff [sic] SoS Adrian Fontes Application for Attorneys Fees Costs | |||
3/29/2023 | NOT - Notice | 3/30/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata | |||
3/28/2023 | NOT - Notice | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Supplemental Authority and Evidence in Support of Contestants Motion for Reconsideration | |||
3/27/2023 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 3/27/2023 | |
NOTE: OBJECTION AND OPPOSITION TO ADRIAN FONTES' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |||
3/27/2023 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 3/27/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS | |||
3/21/2023 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 3/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Application for Attorneys' Fees | |||
3/21/2023 | NOT - Notice | 3/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Form of Final Judgment | |||
3/16/2023 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 3/17/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration of Under Advisement Ruling | |||
3/6/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/6/2023 | |
2/23/2023 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 2/23/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY / WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
2/23/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order | |||
2/21/2023 | APL - Application | 2/21/2023 | |
NOTE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY (WITH CLIENT CONSENT) | |||
2/6/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 2/7/2023 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
2/6/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index | 2/7/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
2/3/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/7/2023 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
1/17/2023 | MOT - Motion | 1/17/2023 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State's Joinder in Adrian Fontes' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions | |||
1/10/2023 | REL - Reply | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State Adrian Fontes' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions | |||
1/6/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
1/5/2023 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Opposition to Secretary of State-Elect Adrian Fontes' Motion for Sanctions | |||
1/3/2023 | NOT - Notice | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer | |||
12/29/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
12/29/2022 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
12/29/2022 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State-Elect Adrian Fontes' Verified Statement of Costs | |||
12/28/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 12/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel with Client Consent | |||
12/28/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State-Elect Adrian Fontes' Motion for Sanctions | |||
12/28/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS' JOINDER IN SECRETARY OF STATE-ELECT ADRIAN FONTES' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
12/28/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO ARIZONA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(H) | |||
12/22/2022 | RNM - Returned Mail | 12/22/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/21/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal | |||
12/16/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 12/16/2022 | |
12/15/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/15/2022 | |
12/15/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST | |||
12/15/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Secretary of State-Elect Adrian Fontes' Motion to Dismiss | |||
12/14/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Consolidated Opposition to Motions to Dismiss | |||
12/14/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata | |||
12/13/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR | |||
12/13/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/13/2022 | |
12/13/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Rule 7.1(h), Ariz. R. Civ. P. | |||
12/13/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ELECTION CONTEST WITH PREJUDICE | |||
12/13/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State-Elect Adrian Fontes' Motion to Dismiss | |||
12/13/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Certificate of Counsel Pursuant to Arizona Rule of Civil Procedure | |||
12/13/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 12/13/2022 | |
12/12/2022 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 12/13/2022 | |
NOTE: First Amended Verified Statement of Election Contest | |||
12/12/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR | |||
12/12/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/12/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Recusal | |||
12/12/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/12/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 12/12/2022 | |
12/12/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 12/12/2022 | |
12/9/2022 | COM - Complaint | 12/9/2022 | |
12/9/2022 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/9/2022 | |
12/9/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/9/2022 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/13/2022 | 10:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/13/2022 | 10:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/16/2022 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
12/19/2022 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
5/26/2023 | F:Katie Hobbs | $91.58 | Monthly | Costs | |
A: Mark Finchem | |||||
5/26/2023 | F:Katie Hobbs | $7,434.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Daniel J McCauleey III | |||||
5/26/2023 | F:Adrian Fontes | $292.55 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Mark Finchem | |||||
5/26/2023 | F:Adrian Fontes | $40,272.50 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Mark Finchem |